UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Powell
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Angela G Powell
Case Number: 4:2016cv00137
Filed: February 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Fannin
Presiding Judge: Ron Clark
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Defaulted Student Loans (Excl. Veterans)
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1080
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 46 Report and Recommendations. It is, therefore, ORDERED that Defendants Amended Motion to Appoint Counsel (Dkt. #41) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/26/2017. (baf, )
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE - Having received the report of the United States Magistrate Judge, having considered each of Defendant's timely filed objections (Dkt. #42), and having conducted a de novo review, the Court is of the opinion that the findings and conclusions of the Magistrate Judge are correct and adopts the Magistrate Judge's report (Dkt. #37) as the findings and conclusions of the Court. It is, therefore, ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Appoint Counsel (Dkt. 35 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/4/2017. (baf, )
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 AMENDED MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 28 Report and Recommendations. Came on for consideration the Report of the United States Magistrate Judge in this action,this matter having been heret ofore referred to the Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636. On January 17, 2017, the Report of the Magistrate Judge (Dkt. #28) was entered containing proposed findings of fact and recommendations that the Government's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. # 18 be granted. The Court entered pro se Defendant Angela G. Powell's Acknowledgment of Receipt (Dkt. #29) on January 20, 2017. Having received the Report of the United States Magistrate Judge, and no objections thereto having been timely filed, this Court is of the opinion that the findings and conclusions of the Magistrate Judge are correct and adopts the Magistrate Judge's Report as the findings and conclusions of the Court. It is, therefore, ORDERED that the Government's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 18 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/15/2017. (baf, )
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 28 Report and Recommendations, GRANTING 18 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/13/2017. (baf, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Robert Austin Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela G Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?