Securities and Exchange Commission v. Mapp, III et al

Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: William E Mapp, III and Warren K Paxton, Jr.
Case Number: 4:2016cv00246
Filed: April 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Amos L. Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 200 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that the Securities and Exchange Commission's Motion for Remedies and to Enter Final Judgment against Defendant William E. Mapp, III (Dkt. # 191 ) is hereby GRANTED in part. The SEC's requests for an injunction, disgorgement, and pre-judgement interest are DENIED. It is further ORDERED that William E. Mapp, III, pay a civil penalty of $22,500. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/25/2018. (rpc, )
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 149 Motion for Reconsideration Regarding Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by William E Mapp, III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/11/2017. (cm, )
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Granting in Part Denying in Part 111 MOTION to Strike (Defendant's Corrected Motion to Srike Plaintiff's Expert) filed by William E Mapp, III. The Court strikes Charles Marler from testifying as an expert witness on whether the chart and other statements referred to in Servergys offering materials were misleading. However, the Court permits Charles Marler to testify as an expert regarding whether Servergys representations were false. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/14/2017. (cm, )
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 112 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by William E Mapp, III. Defendants Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Dkt. #112) is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/9/2017. (cm, )
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 116 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by William E Mapp, III, 113 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment and Brief in Support filed by Securities and Exchan ge Commission. Defendants Partial Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. #116) is hereby DENIED. Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. #113) is hereby GRANTED only to the extent that Servergys Series A, B, C, and WFG Offering are considered a single offering under the principle of integration. The remainder of Plaintiffs motion is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/8/2017. (cm, )
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 44 MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 9(b) and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Warren K Paxton, Jr.. Defendant Warren K. Paxton, Jr.s Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #44) is hereby GRANTED and Plaintiffs claims against Defendant Warren K. Paxton, Jr. are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/2/17. (cm, )
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - It is therefore ORDERED that: (1) Respondent Warren K. Paxton, Jr.s Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #16) is CONDITIONALLY GRANTED pending the Courts review of the Commissions submission of additional facts and (2) the Commissio n is GRANTED leave to amend its allegations against Paxton to the extent that it has additional facts that might support a claim under the statutes alleged in the Complaint. It is further ORDERED that: (1) any such amendment must be filed within fourteen (14) days of the issuance of this order and (2) the Commission must place any new facts not previously alleged in the original Complaint in bold typeface. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/7/2016. (baf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Mapp, III et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Matthew Gulde
Represented By: Jessica B Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William E Mapp, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren K Paxton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?