Liverman et al v. Denton County, Texas, Criminal District Attorney et al
Plaintiff: Roger Liverman and Aaron Liverman
Defendant: Denton County, Texas, Criminal District Attorney, Paul Johnson, Lara Tomlin, Rick Daniel, Lindsey Sheguit and Katheryn Payne Hall
Case Number: 4:2016cv00801
Filed: October 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Denton
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Presiding Judge: Amos L. Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 68 Report and Recommendations. Accordingly, the District Attorney's Office's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 65) is GRANTED. The case as to the Defendant Denton County Criminal District Attorneys Office a/k/a Denton County, Texas, Criminal District Attorney shall be dismissed with all costs to be borne by the party incurring same. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/15/2017. (daj, )
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 58 Report and Recommendations. Defendant Hall's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 52 ) is GRANTED, and her Motion to Strike (Dkt. 52 ) is DENIED as moot. The case as to Defendant Katheryn Payne Hall shall be dismissed with all costs to be borne by the party incurring same. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/15/2017. (baf, )
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 40 Report and Recommendations, 18 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Paul Johnson, Lindsey Sheguit, Denton County, Texas, Criminal District Attorney, Lara Toml in, Rick Daniel. The District Attorney Defendants' Consolidated Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss, pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(5) and 12(b)(6) (Dkt. 18 ), is GRANTED, and Plaintiffs' claims against Denton County Criminal District Attorney Paul Johnson and three Assistant Criminal District Attorneys, Lara Tomlin, Rick Daniel, and Lindsey Sheguit, are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice, with all costs to be borne by the party incurring same. All other named Defendants remain in the suit at this time. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/23/2017. (baf, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liverman et al v. Denton County, Texas, Criminal District Attorney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Liverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Liverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denton County, Texas, Criminal District Attorney
Represented By: John Joseph Feldt, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Johnson
Represented By: John Joseph Feldt, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lara Tomlin
Represented By: John Joseph Feldt, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Daniel
Represented By: John Joseph Feldt, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsey Sheguit
Represented By: John Joseph Feldt, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katheryn Payne Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?