Orthosie Systems, LLC v. Actsoft, Inc.
Plaintiff: Orthosie Systems LLC
Defendant: Actsoft, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv00873
Filed: November 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Amos L. Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/4/2017. (baf, )
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - It is therefore ORDERED that Defendant Actsoft, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement (Dkt. 24 ) is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/25/2017. (baf, )
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 39 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement Based on Improper Venue filed by Actsoft, Inc. ORDERED that Actsoft's Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement Base on Improper Venue (Dkt. #39) is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/25/2017. (kls, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orthosie Systems, LLC v. Actsoft, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orthosie Systems LLC
Represented By: Ronald William Burns, Jr
Represented By: Mazin Ahmad Sbaiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actsoft, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?