Boyd v. Collin County, Texas
Plaintiff: Boyd and Derek Boyd
Defendant: Collin County, Texas and Collin County Texas
Not Classified By Court: Mark Gilbert
Case Number: 4:2017cv00165
Filed: March 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. All relief not previously granted is hereby denied. The Clerk is directed to close this civil action. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/8/2018. (daj, )
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Collin County Texas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Robert)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER ON CLOSING DOCUMENTS, ( Closing Documents due by 1/16/2018). Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/18/2017. (cm, )
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REPORT of Mediation by Mark Gilbert. Mediation result: SETTLED(Carnahan, Michael)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Collin County Texas 3rd Supplemental Disclosures (Davis, Robert)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Collin County Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Robert)
October 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Collin County Texas Second Supplemental Disclosures (Davis, Robert)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OPINION re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Title VII claims filed by Collin County Texas. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint (Dkt. #21) is hereby GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs hostile work environment claim is DISMISSED with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that the motion be DENIED as to the remainder of the claims. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/12/2017. (rpc, )
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 JOINT AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSIONOF TIME REGARDING DEADLINES FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The deadline for Collin Countys Motion For Summary Judgment shall be November 15, 2017. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/11/2017. (rpc, )
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment by Collin County Texas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Robert)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Collin County Texas Expert Disclosure (Davis, Robert)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS IMPLICIT REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO AMEND by Collin County Texas re #24 Response in Opposition to Motion Collin County Response to Implicit Request For Leave To Amend (Davis, Robert) Modified on 8/24/2017 (cm, ).
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Title VII claims filed by Collin County Texas. (Davis, Robert)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #26 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Title VII claims Replies due by 8/24/2017. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/17/17. (cm, )
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Title VII claims by Collin County Texas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Robert)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the STIPULATION, #25 submitted by Collin County Texas. To be refiled in Motion format using a the Motion for Extension of Time to File event code. Correction should be made by one business day. (cm, )
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ***FILED IN ERROR. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE IGNORE.*** STIPULATION re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Title VII claims by Collin County Texas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Robert) Modified on 8/17/2017 (cm, ). Modified on 8/18/2017 (cm, ).
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Title VII claims filed by Derek Boyd. (Hindman, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2017: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (cm, ).
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND. #22 Stipulation filed by Derek Boyd re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Title VII claims filed by Collin County Texas, ( Response to Motion to Dismiss due by 8/11/2017). Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/27/17. (cm, )
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to MTD by Derek Boyd. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Stipulation to Extend Time)(Hindman, Michael)
July 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Title VII claims by Collin County Texas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Robert)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Mediation packet mailed to mediator. Mediation Report deadline set for 1/12/2018. (cm, )
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2018 09:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Amended Pleadings due by 9/6/2017. Discovery due by 11/15/2017. Expert Witness List due by 8/9/2017. Joinder of Parties due by 7/12/2017. Mediation Completion due by 1/12/2018. Motions due by 10/13/2017. Motions in Limine due by 2/2/2018. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/2/2018. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/14/17. (cm, )
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Mark Gilbert added as Mediator. The mediator shall file a report within five days of the completion of the mediationconference. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/14/17. (cm, )
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #17 Motion for Protective Order. This Order is made under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c). It governs any document, information, or other thing furnished by any party to any other party, and it includes any nonparty who receives a subpoena in connection with this action. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/7/17. (cm, )
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Collin County Texas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Robert)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: In Chambers Scheduling Conference held on 5/31/2017. (Court Reporter None.) (dm, )
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Collin County Texas (Davis, Robert)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Robert)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Collin County Texas (Davis, Robert)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS, ( Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/18/2017., Rule 16 Management Conference set for 5/31/2017 10:30 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before Judge Amos L. Mazzant III.). Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/13/17. (cm, )
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, by Collin County Texas.(Davis, Robert)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Collin County Texas.( Davis, Robert)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Collin County Texas to 4/7/2017. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( cm, )
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 10, Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint submitted by Collin County Texas. Blank application filed. Correction should be made by One business day. (cm, )
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE IGNORE.*** Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Collin County Texas.( Davis, Robert) Modified on 3/23/2017 (cm, ).
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,,,, as to County's Answer Date by Collin County Texas. (Davis, Robert)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Jacob Davis on behalf of Collint County, Texas (Davis, Robert)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Derek Boyd. (pad, )
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Complaint,,,,.. (Hindman, Michael)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:17-cv-00596. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (pad, )
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (pad, )
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Transferring to Another District: Case transferred to Sherman Division of the Eastern District of Texas. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/6/2017) (epm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/7/2017.]
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division filed by Derek Boyd (Hindman, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/7/2017.]
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ran) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/7/2017.]
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Derek Boyd. (Hindman, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/7/2017.]
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Derek Boyd filed by Derek Boyd. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8243507) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Hindman, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/7/2017.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd v. Collin County, Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Boyd
Represented By: Michael J Hindman
Represented By: Michael James Hindman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collin County, Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collin County Texas
Represented By: Robert Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Mark Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?