Hidden Cove Park and Marina et al v. Lexington Insurance Company et al
Case Number: 4:2017cv00193
Filed: March 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Amos L. Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Defendants' Motion to Amend Order to Certify for Interlocutory Appeal (Dkt. # 54 ) is hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/22/2018. (rpc, )
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - It is therefore ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Policy Interpretation (Dkt. 31 ) is hereby DENIED and Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendants Lexington Insurance Company and AIG Claims Inc. (Dkt. 32 ) is hereby GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/9/2017. (baf, )
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - On May 23, 2017, the Court held a telephonic hearing regarding a discovery dispute in this case. Having considered the argument of counsel and letter briefing on the dispute, the Court orders Defendants to produce un redacted claim notes regarding loss reserve information. Defendants agreed to produce the redacted claim notes dated October 1, 2015 through December 8, 2015. Plaintiffs may depose Defendants' 30(b)(6) deponent limited to the information included in the previously redacted claim notes. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/6/2017. (baf, )
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand (Dkt. 15 ) is hereby DENIED, and Glenn Hollmuller is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/16/2017. (baf, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hidden Cove Park and Marina et al v. Lexington Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?