Securities and Exchange Commission v. Bryant et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Thurman P Bryant, III, Bryant United Capital Funding, Inc., Arthur F Wammel, Wammel Group, LLC, Thurman P Bryant, Jr. and Carlos Goodspeed
Receiver: Jennifer Ecklund
Case Number: 4:2017cv00336
Filed: May 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Amos L. Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 335 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is ORDERED that the Receiver's Motion to Liquidate Property and Void or Clarify Contract for Deed (Dkt. # 298 ) is GRANTED IN PART. The Receiver is NOT permitted to liquidate the Property at this time. It is fur ther ORDERED that on or before Friday, August 30, 2019, at 5:00 p.m., the Parties are to meet, confer, and file as a motion before Court a proposed expedited discovery schedule. It is further ORDERED that Garrett's Motion for Leave to File Late Sur-Reply in Excess of Page Limit (Dkt. # 319 ) AND Receiver's Response to Defendant Garrett's Motion for Leave, Motion to Strike Garrett's Sur-Reply and/or, in the Alternative, Motion for Leave to Respond (Dkt. # 328 ) are BOTH DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/19/2019. (rpc, )
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court finds that motions 184 and 185 should be denied. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/18/2018. (rpc, )
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 97 MOTION to Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order re 16 Temporary Restraining Order, Set Hearings, Terminate Motions, MOTION to Withdraw 16 Temporary Restraining Order, Set Hearings, Terminate Motions, [17 ] Order, filed by Bryant United Capital Funding, Inc., Thurman P Bryant, III. It is ORDERED that the Bryant Defendants Motion to Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order and Suspend or Dissolve Order Appointing Receiver (Dkt. #97) is hereby DENIED. It is further ORDERED that unless terminated earlier, this preliminary injunction shall expire upon the issuance of a final decision by the Court in this case. It is further ORDERED that unless terminated earlier, the Receivership in place shall expire upon the issuance of a final decision by the Court in this case. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/4/2017. (rpc, )
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 44 Ex Parte Document, filed by Jennifer Ecklund, 56 Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration of Ex Parte TRO, Preliminary Injunction, Asset Freeze, and Receivership Orders filed by Wammel Group, LLC, A rthur F Wammel. Receivers Motion for Preliminary Injunction(Dkt. #44) is hereby GRANTED. Arthur F. Wammel and Wammel Group, LLCs Motion for Reconsideration (Dkt. #56) is hereby DENIED. It is further ORDERED that unless terminated earlier, this preliminary injunction shall expire upon the issuance of a final decision by the Court in this case. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/15/17. (cm, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Bryant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Jessica B Magee
Represented By: Jason Patrick Reinsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thurman P Bryant, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryant United Capital Funding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur F Wammel
Represented By: James Madison Ardoin, III
Represented By: Toby M Galloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wammel Group, LLC
Represented By: James Madison Ardoin, III
Represented By: Toby M Galloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thurman P Bryant, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Goodspeed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Jennifer Ecklund
Represented By: Katharine Battaia Clark
Represented By: Timothy E Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?