Soniat v. Mitchell
Plaintiff: Shelley Soniat
Defendant: Carolyn A Mitchell
Case Number: 4:2017cv00572
Filed: August 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Denton
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Presiding Judge: Amos L. Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 19 Report and Recommendations. Defendant Carolyn A. Mitchell's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #14) is GRANTED. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that this entire action, and all of the claims asserted therein, is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs. All relief not previously granted is hereby DENIED, and the Clerk is directed to CLOSE this civil action. The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff is required to obtain leave of court prior to filing any other actions in the Court from an active Eastern District of Texas Judge assigned to the division in which the case will be filed or the Chief Judge of the Eastern District of Texas. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/4/2018. (daj, )
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER AND OPINION - DENYING 11 MOTION for Recusal filed by Shelley Soniat. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 9/20/2017. (baf, )
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND OPINION - The Court finds Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney (Dkt. 5 ) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 9/1/2017. (baf, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soniat v. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley Soniat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn A Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?