Ericsson Inc. et al v. LG Electronics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Ericsson Inc and Ericsson Inc.
Defendant: LG Electronics, Inc. and LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00186
Filed: March 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Referring Judge: Richard A Schell
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. All claims asserted by Ericsson against LG in this case are hereby dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Richard A. Schell on 9/18/2018. (rpc, )
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TRANSFER ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the above-named civil action is transferred to the Honorable Richard A. Schell, effective immediately. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/27/2018. (rpc, )
July 30, 2018 Filing 17 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Melsheimer, Thomas)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. The deadline for all Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended to July 31, 2018. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/11/2018. (rpc, )
July 2, 2018 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bittner, Michael)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/12/2018. (rpc, )
April 10, 2018 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Melsheimer, Thomas)
March 22, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued as to LG Electronics, Inc. (rpc, )
March 22, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued as to LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. (rpc, )
March 21, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christine Michelle Woodin on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Woodin, Christine)
March 21, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas M Mathews on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mathews, Nicholas)
March 21, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Theodore Stevenson, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Stevenson, Theodore)
March 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rex Andrew Mann on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mann, Rex)
March 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Andrew Bittner on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bittner, Michael)
March 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Brett Johnson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Johnson, Michael)
March 20, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
March 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Siebman Forrest on behalf of Ericsson Inc, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Forrest, Elizabeth)
March 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clyde Moody Siebman on behalf of Ericsson Inc, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Siebman, Clyde)
March 19, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
March 19, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ericsson Inc, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson identifying Corporate Parent Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericcson, Corporate Parent Ericsson Holding II Inc. for Ericsson Inc. (Melsheimer, Thomas)
March 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6705196.), filed by Ericsson Inc, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Melsheimer, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ericsson Inc. et al v. LG Electronics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: Elizabeth Siebman Forrest
Represented By: Christine Michelle Woodin
Represented By: Michael Brett Johnson
Represented By: Theodore Stevenson, III
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Represented By: Rex Andrew Mann
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Nicholas M Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ericsson Inc
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ericsson Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: Elizabeth Siebman Forrest
Represented By: Christine Michelle Woodin
Represented By: Michael Brett Johnson
Represented By: Theodore Stevenson, III
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Represented By: Rex Andrew Mann
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Nicholas M Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?