Hammack v. Capital One Auto Finance, Inc.
Plaintiff: William Hammack
Defendant: Capital One Auto Finance, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00513
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Capital One Auto Finance, Inc. to 9/19/2018. 7 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( daj, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Capital One Auto Finance, Inc..( Miguez, Wilson)
August 9, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Capital One Auto Finance, Inc. to 9/12/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( daj, )
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Capital One Auto Finance, Inc..(Sauer, Courtney)
July 19, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by William Hammack. (daj, )
July 19, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (daj, )
July 19, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (daj, )
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capital One Auto Finance, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6860844.), filed by William Hammack. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Paschal, Dustin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammack v. Capital One Auto Finance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Hammack
Represented By: Dustin Alan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Auto Finance, Inc.
Represented By: Wilson Joseph Miguez, III
Represented By: Courtney Lynn Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?