McQueary v. Air Evac EMS, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mikkaa D. McQueary
Defendant: Air Evac EMS, Inc, Air Evac Lifeteam and Air Evac EMS, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00562
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Filing 10 ***NOW ATTACHED TO #9 . PLEASE DISREGARD.*** NOTICE by Air Evac EMS, Inc. re #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Proposed Scheduling Order Deadlines (Richter, Patrick) Modified on 10/1/2018 (rpc, ).
October 1, 2018 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Richter, Patrick) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/1/2018: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order) (rpc, ).
September 24, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 8 Defendant's Original ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Air Evac EMS, Inc..(Richter, Patrick)
September 14, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Air Evac EMS, Inc. to 9/21/2018. 7 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
September 14, 2018 Filing 7 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Air Evac EMS, Inc..( Richter, Patrick)
August 31, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mikkaa D. McQueary.(Wash, Danny)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/1/2018. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 10/16/2018 at 02:30 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/27/2018. (rpc, )
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND ADVISORY. The Court ORDERS the parties to replead as necessary to comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Court's Local Rules. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/9/2018. (daj, )
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 ***ORIGINAL ANSWER FILED IN STATE COURT***, ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Air Evac EMS, Inc.(daj, )
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 ***ORIGINAL PETITION FILED IN STATE COURT***COMPLAINT against Air Evac EMS, Inc, Air Evac Lifeteam, filed by Mikkaa D. McQueary.(daj, )
August 9, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (daj, )
August 9, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (daj, )
August 8, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Air Evac Lifeteam, Air Evac EMS, Inc from 62nd Judicial District Court Lamar County, case number 87650. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6890052), filed by Air Evac Lifeteam, Air Evac EMS, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings)(Richter, Patrick) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2018: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (daj, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McQueary v. Air Evac EMS, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikkaa D. McQueary
Represented By: Danny C Wash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Evac EMS, Inc
Represented By: Patrick Scott Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Evac Lifeteam
Represented By: Patrick Scott Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Evac EMS, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Scott Richter
Represented By: Julie Christine Tower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?