Stone v. Director, TDCJ-CID

Petitioner: Kevin Edward Stone
Respondent: Director, TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 4:2018cv00590
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Office: Sherman Office
County: Anderson
0 Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
1 Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2018 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. Case transferred from Texas Eastern has been opened in SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS as case 4:18-cv-03469, filed 09/27/2018. (daj, )
September 7, 2018 Interdistrict transfer to the Southern District of Texas Houston Division. (daj, )
September 7, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER OF TRANSFER. ORDERED that Petitioner's case is TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division. 28 U.S.C. 2241(d). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 9/7/2018. (daj, )
August 17, 2018 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number TXE100016986 (daj, )
August 17, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (daj, )
August 17, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (daj, )
August 17, 2018 2 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Sirianni, Robert)
August 17, 2018 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus BY A PERSON IN STATE CUSTODY, filed by Kevin Edward Stone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Sirianni, Robert) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/17/2018) (daj, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stone v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin Edward Stone
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Sirianni, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director, TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?