Alce v. UHP, LP
Plaintiff: Joel Alce
Defendant: UHP, LP
Case Number: 4:2018cv00594
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Sherman
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) filed by UHP, LP. (Attachments: #1 Amended Declaration of Dorie Hutchinson)(Wolf, Tracy)
October 5, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) Amended filed by Joel Alce. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Joel Alce, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Motley, Susan)
October 5, 2018 Filing 8 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. SEE #9 *** RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) filed by Joel Alce. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Motley, Susan) Modified on 10/5/2018 (rpc, ).
September 21, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) by UHP, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Dorie Hutchinson, #2 Exhibit UBH Alternative Resolution for Conflicts "ARC" Agreement)(Wolf, Tracy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2018: #3 Text of Proposed Order) (rpc, ).
September 18, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for UHP, LP to 9/21/2018. 4 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
September 18, 2018 Filing 6 Defendant's Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re UHP, LP.( Wolf, Tracy)
September 18, 2018 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Defendant's Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #5 submitted by UHP, LP. The New Deadline Date is incorrect. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** Defendant's Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re UHP, LP.( Wolf, Tracy) Modified on 9/18/2018 (rpc, ).
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joel Alce. All Parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Return receipt card)(Motley, Susan)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joel Alce. UHP, LP served on 8/27/2018, answer due 9/17/2018. (Motley, Susan)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to UHP, LP. (rpc, )
August 20, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
August 20, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Original against UHP, LP d/b/a University Behavioral ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6906402.), filed by Joel Alce. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons(es))(Motley, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alce v. UHP, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UHP, LP
Represented By: Tracy Graves Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Alce
Represented By: Susan Denara Motley
Represented By: Grace Ann Weatherly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?