Glenn v. Wal-Mart Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Gabriella Glenn
Defendant: Walmart Inc, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walmart and Wal-Mart Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2018cv00648
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
1 Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2018 9 REPORT OF RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING Joint Conference Report by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Incorporated, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walmart. (Ullrich, Rachel) Modified on 11/9/2018 (rpc, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/9/2018: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (rpc, ).
November 7, 2018 8 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Incorporated, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walmart (Ullrich, Rachel)
October 9, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/11/2018. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 12/11/2018 at 01:30 PM in Ctrm 108 (Plano) before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 10/9/2018. (rpc, )
September 19, 2018 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION to Remand to State Court #5 submitted by Gabriella Glenn. The Motion does not contain a Certificate of Conference. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
September 18, 2018 6 NOTICE by Gabriella Glenn re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Kizzia, Don)
September 18, 2018 5 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** MOTION to Remand to State Court by Gabriella Glenn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kizzia, Don) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2018: #2 Text of Proposed Order) (rpc, ). Modified on 9/19/2018 (rpc, ).
September 13, 2018 4 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #3 Petition by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Incorporated, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walmart.(rpc, )
September 13, 2018 3 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** PETITION against Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Incorporated, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walmart, filed by Gabriella Glenn.(rpc, )
September 13, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
September 12, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (rpc, )
September 12, 2018 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Walmart Inc (Ullrich, Rachel)
September 12, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Inc from 431st Judicial District, Denton County, TX, case number 2018-6058. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6940144), filed by Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Ullrich, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glenn v. Wal-Mart Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriella Glenn
Represented By: Don Bradley Kizzia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Represented By: Rachel Ziolkowski Ullrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel Elise Kelly
Represented By: Rachel Ziolkowski Ullrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel Elise Kelly
Represented By: Rachel Ziolkowski Ullrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart
Represented By: Rachel Elise Kelly
Represented By: Rachel Ziolkowski Ullrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Incorporated
Represented By: Rachel Elise Kelly
Represented By: Rachel Ziolkowski Ullrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?