Juluke v. MDT Frankford Village, Ltd.

Plaintiff: James Joseph Juluke, Jr.
Defendant: MDT Frankford Village, Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00665
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12181
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Mussman, Louis)
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Joseph Juluke, Jr. MDT Frankford Village, Ltd. served on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (Mussman, Louis)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 12/13/2018 at 2:30 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 11/28/2018. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/25/2018. (baf, )
October 12, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by MDT Frankford Village, Ltd..(Pullman, Richard)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seth Parker Crosland on behalf of James Joseph Juluke, Jr (Crosland, Seth)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to MDT Frankford Village, Ltd.. (daj, )
September 24, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (daj, )
September 24, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (daj, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MDT Frankford Village, Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6952319.), filed by James Joseph Juluke, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons(es))(Mussman, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juluke v. MDT Frankford Village, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Joseph Juluke, Jr.
Represented By: Louis I Mussman
Represented By: Seth Parker Crosland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MDT Frankford Village, Ltd.
Represented By: Richard David Pullman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?