Enhua v. PepsiCo Inc
Plaintiff: Felicia Enhua
Respondent: Pepsico Inc
Case Number: 4:2018cv00678
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2018 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Cowley, Raymond)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/11/2018. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 12/11/2018 at 01:30 PM in Ctrm 108 (Plano) before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 10/9/2018. (rpc, )
September 25, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
September 25, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (rpc, )
September 25, 2018 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:18-cv-02166. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 24, 2018 Interdistrict transfer to United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas, Sherman Division. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 9/24/2018, filed. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/25/2018.]
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas, Sherman Division #5 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/25/2018.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Conference re: #8 Certificate of Conference, #5 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Texas by Pepsico Inc, filed.(Cowley, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/25/2018.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Conference re: #5 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Texas by Pepsico Inc, filed.(Cowley, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/25/2018.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Pepsico Inc, filed.(Ferandez, Rea) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/25/2018.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Pepsico Inc, filed.(Cowley, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/25/2018.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Texas by Pepsico Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXH. A -- Aff. of Howard, #2 Proposed Order)(Cowley, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/25/2018.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 4 RETURN of Service, filed.(Davis-Smith, Shelly) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/25/2018.]
July 24, 2018 Summons Issued as to Pepsico Inc. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(JenniferOlson, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/25/2018.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Pepsico Inc, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Davis-Smith, Shelly) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/25/2018.]
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 9/24/2018 at 03:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes(Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/25/2018.]
June 27, 2018 Filing 1 Original Complaint by Felicia Enhua (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0541-20347322), filed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis-Smith, Shelly) Payment information added on 7/3/2018 (ltien, 4). [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/25/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enhua v. PepsiCo Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Enhua
Represented By: Shelly M Davis-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pepsico Inc
Represented By: Raymond A Cowley
Represented By: Rea Katrina Ferandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?