Juluke v. Josey/Trinity Mills, Ltd. et al

Plaintiff: James Joseph Juluke, Jr.
Defendant: Josey/Trinity Mills Two, LLC, Josey/Trinity Mills, Ltd. and Weitzman Management Corporation
Case Number: 4:2018cv00722
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12181
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendants to file a responsive pleading or motion is extended up to and including December 17, 2018. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/19/2018. (rpc, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #7 Amended Complaint by Josey/Trinity Mills, Ltd., Weitzman Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bruce, Stacy)
November 6, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to Weitzman Management Corporation. (rpc, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Josey/Trinity Mills, Ltd., Weitzman Management Corporation, filed by James Joseph Juluke, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(Mussman, Louis)
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Joseph Juluke, Jr. Josey/Trinity Mills Two, LLC served on 10/16/2018, answer due 11/6/2018. (Mussman, Louis)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Joseph Juluke, Jr. Josey/Trinity Mills, Ltd. served on 10/16/2018, answer due 11/6/2018. (Mussman, Louis)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seth Parker Crosland on behalf of James Joseph Juluke, Jr (Crosland, Seth)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Josey/Trinity Mills, Ltd. (rpc, )
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Josey/Trinity Mills Two, LLC. (rpc, )
October 10, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
October 10, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Josey/Trinity Mills Two, LLC, Josey/Trinity Mills, Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6975739.), filed by James Joseph Juluke, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mussman, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juluke v. Josey/Trinity Mills, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josey/Trinity Mills Two, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josey/Trinity Mills, Ltd.
Represented By: Stacy Hoffman Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weitzman Management Corporation
Represented By: Stacy Hoffman Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Joseph Juluke, Jr.
Represented By: Seth Parker Crosland
Represented By: Louis I Mussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?