Cairns v. Pie & Coffee, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Anthony Cairns
Defendant: Pie & Coffee, LLC and Suriya Legacy LP
Case Number: 4:2018cv00749
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
0 Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
1 Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint with Prejudice by Anthony Cairns. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Douglas) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/6/2018) (baf, ).
November 23, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Pie & Coffee, LLC to 12/11/2018. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( kls, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Pie & Coffee, LLC.( Regel, Kristin)
November 21, 2018 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Complaint #5 submitted by Pie & Coffee, LLC. The document should be filed using event code, Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY. INCORRECT DOCKET EVENT USED*** Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Complaint by Pie & Coffee, LLC. (Regel, Kristin) Modified on 11/21/2018 (rpc, ).
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Cairns. Pie & Coffee, LLC served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Schapiro, Douglas)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Suriya Legacy LP. (baf, )
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Pie & Coffee, LLC. (baf, )
October 18, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
October 18, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (baf, )
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Injunctive Relief Sought against Pie & Coffee, LLC, Suriya Legacy LP ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6988407.), filed by Anthony Cairns. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet,(Schapiro, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cairns v. Pie & Coffee, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pie & Coffee, LLC
Represented By: Kristin Anne Regel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suriya Legacy LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Cairns
Represented By: Emil Lippe, Jr
Represented By: Douglas Steven Schapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?