Ramirez v. Load Trail, LLC

Plaintiff: Jacinto Ramirez, Orlando Piedra Flores, Luis Morales and Salvador Leon
Defendant: Load Trail, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00756
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE by Orlando Piedra Flores, Salvador Leon, Luis Morales, Jacinto Ramirez of Filing Consent to Join Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Irving W. Juarez)(Currier, Rebecca)
December 18, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, by Load Trail, LLC.(Daniels, Ruth)
December 14, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE by Orlando Piedra Flores, Salvador Leon, Luis Morales, Jacinto Ramirez of Filing Consent to Join Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - J. Carmen Garcia)(Currier, Rebecca)
November 29, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE by Orlando Piedra Flores, Salvador Leon, Luis Morales, Jacinto Ramirez of Filing Consents to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - David Cruz and Raymundo Olmedo.)(Currier, Rebecca)
November 28, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE by Orlando Piedra Flores, Salvador Leon, Luis Morales, Jacinto Ramirez of Filing Consent to Join Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Manuel A. Medina)(Currier, Rebecca)
November 28, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luis Morales, Salvador Leon, Jacinto Ramirez, Orlando Piedra Flores. Load Trail, LLC served on 11/26/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Currier, Rebecca)
November 27, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE by Orlando Piedra Flores, Salvador Leon, Luis Morales, Jacinto Ramirez of Filing Amended Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jose Luis Hernandez)(Currier, Rebecca)
November 26, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE by Orlando Piedra Flores, Salvador Leon, Luis Morales, Jacinto Ramirez of Filing Consent to Join Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Miguel Angel Duran Lopez)(Currier, Rebecca)
November 20, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE by Orlando Piedra Flores, Salvador Leon, Luis Morales, Jacinto Ramirez of Filing Amended Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Odon Martinez)(Currier, Rebecca)
November 16, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE by Orlando Piedra Flores, Salvador Leon, Luis Morales, Jacinto Ramirez Consents to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Consents to Join)(Currier, Rebecca)
November 16, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE by Orlando Piedra Flores, Salvador Leon, Luis Morales, Jacinto Ramirez Consents to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Consents to Join)(Currier, Rebecca)
November 16, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE by Orlando Piedra Flores, Salvador Leon, Luis Morales, Jacinto Ramirez Consents to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Consents to Join)(Currier, Rebecca)
November 16, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by Orlando Piedra Flores, Salvador Leon, Luis Morales, Jacinto Ramirez Consent to Joins (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Consent to Joins)(Currier, Rebecca)
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jacinto Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Luis Morales, #2 Exhibit Consent to Join Orlando Piedra Flores, #3 Exhibit Consent to Join Salvador Leon)(Currier, Rebecca)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by Jacinto Ramirez of Filing Consent to Join Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join FLSA Collective Action)(Currier, Rebecca)
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Jacinto Ramirez of Filing Amended Consents to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Miguel Oliva and Manuel Barrios Pablo)(Currier, Rebecca)
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Jacinto Ramirez of Filing Consent to Join Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Raciel Osorio Lopez)(Currier, Rebecca)
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Jacinto Ramirez of Filing Consent to Join Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join)(Currier, Rebecca)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Load Trail, LLC. (rpc, )
October 23, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
October 22, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Load Trail, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6993269.), filed by Jacinto Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Currier, Rebecca) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2018: #2 Exhibit A - Consent to Become Party Plaintiff) (rpc, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Load Trail, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacinto Ramirez
Represented By: Rebecca Holly Currier
Represented By: Allen Ryan Vaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Piedra Flores
Represented By: Rebecca Holly Currier
Represented By: Allen Ryan Vaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Morales
Represented By: Rebecca Holly Currier
Represented By: Allen Ryan Vaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Leon
Represented By: Rebecca Holly Currier
Represented By: Allen Ryan Vaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Load Trail, LLC
Represented By: Ruth Ann Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?