American Patents LLC v. Panasonic Corporation of North America
Plaintiff: American Patents LLC
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation of North America
Case Number: 4:2018cv00766
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Panasonic Corporation of North America to 1/12/2019. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 16 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Panasonic Corporation of North America. (Yarbrough, Herbert)
November 30, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael J Kasdan on behalf of Panasonic Corporation of North America. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7044804. (Kasdan, Michael)
November 30, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Joseph M Casino on behalf of Panasonic Corporation of North America. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7044763. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice of Appearance)(Casino, Joseph)
November 28, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dallas William Tharpe on behalf of Panasonic Corporation of North America (Tharpe, Dallas)
November 28, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Herbert A Yarbrough, III on behalf of Panasonic Corporation of North America (Yarbrough, Herbert)
November 16, 2018 Filing 11 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY*** Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re American Patents LLC.(Harrington, Zachariah) Modified on 11/16/2018 (rpc, ).
November 16, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Panasonic Corporation of North America to 12/28/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 10 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re American Patents LLC.(Harrington, Zachariah)
November 6, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued as to Panasonic Corporation of North America. (rpc, )
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry Dean Thompson, Jr on behalf of American Patents LLC (Thompson, Larry)
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Ryan Pinckney on behalf of American Patents LLC (Pinckney, Christopher)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael David Ellis on behalf of American Patents LLC (Ellis, Michael)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew J Antonelli on behalf of American Patents LLC (Antonelli, Matthew)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine Susan Bartles on behalf of American Patents LLC (Bartles, Catherine)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis on behalf of American Patents LLC (Davis, Stafford)
October 30, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Harrington, Zachariah)
October 26, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
October 26, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Panasonic Corporation of North America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6999628.), filed by American Patents LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harrington, Zachariah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Patents LLC v. Panasonic Corporation of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation of North America
Represented By: Dallas William Tharpe
Represented By: Herbert A Yarbrough, III
Represented By: Michael J Kasdan
Represented By: Joseph M Casino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Patents LLC
Represented By: Matthew J Antonelli
Represented By: Christopher Ryan Pinckney
Represented By: Catherine Susan Bartles
Represented By: Zachariah Harrington
Represented By: Larry Dean Thompson, Jr
Represented By: Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis
Represented By: Michael David Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?