American Patents LLC v. TCL Corp. et al
Plaintiff: American Patents LLC
Defendant: TCL Electronics Holdings Ltd., TCL Corp., TCL Communication Technology Holdings Ltd., TCL King Electrical Appliances (Huizhou) Co. Ltd., TCL Communication Ltd. and BlackBerry Limited
Case Number: 4:2018cv00767
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Pursuant to Agreement Between the Parties by TCL Communication Ltd., TCL Communication Technology Holdings Ltd., TCL Corp., TCL Electronics Holdings Ltd., TCL King Electrical Appliances (Huizhou) Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, Natalie)
December 12, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE by American Patents LLC re #15 Waiver of Service Executed Joint Notice Regarding Blackberry's Waiver of Service (Dkt 15) (Pinckney, Christopher)
November 16, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for TCL King Electrical Appliances (Huizhou) Co. Ltd., TCL Communication Technology Holdings Ltd., TCL Communication Ltd., TCL Corp., TCL Electronics Holdings Ltd.. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 22 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re TCL Communication Ltd., TCL Communication Technology Holdings Ltd., TCL Corp., TCL Electronics Holdings Ltd., TCL King Electrical Appliances (Huizhou) Co. Ltd..(Bennett, Natalie)
November 15, 2018 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by American Patents LLC. TCL King Electrical Appliances (Huizhou) Co. Ltd. waiver sent on 11/6/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Bartles, Catherine)
November 15, 2018 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by American Patents LLC. TCL Electronics Holdings Ltd. waiver sent on 11/6/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Bartles, Catherine)
November 15, 2018 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by American Patents LLC. TCL Corp. waiver sent on 11/6/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Bartles, Catherine)
November 15, 2018 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by American Patents LLC. TCL Communication Technology Holdings Ltd. waiver sent on 11/6/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Bartles, Catherine)
November 15, 2018 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by American Patents LLC. TCL Communication Ltd. waiver sent on 11/6/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Bartles, Catherine)
November 13, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Natalie A. Bennett on behalf of TCL Communication Ltd., TCL Communication Technology Holdings Ltd., TCL Corp., TCL Electronics Holdings Ltd., TCL King Electrical Appliances (Huizhou) Co. Ltd. (Bennett, Natalie)
November 12, 2018 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by American Patents LLC. BlackBerry Limited waiver sent on 11/6/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Harrington, Zachariah)
November 6, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Issued as to BlackBerry Limited. (baf, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Issued as to TCL King Electrical Appliances (Huizhou) Co. Ltd.. (baf, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued as to TCL Electronics Holdings Ltd.. (baf, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued as to TCL Communication Technology Holdings Ltd.. (baf, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued as to TCL Communication Ltd.. (baf, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued as to TCL Corp.. (baf, )
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry Dean Thompson, Jr on behalf of American Patents LLC (Thompson, Larry)
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Ryan Pinckney on behalf of American Patents LLC (Pinckney, Christopher)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael David Ellis on behalf of American Patents LLC (Ellis, Michael)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew J Antonelli on behalf of American Patents LLC (Antonelli, Matthew)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine Susan Bartles on behalf of American Patents LLC (Bartles, Catherine)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis on behalf of American Patents LLC (Davis, Stafford)
October 30, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Harrington, Zachariah)
October 26, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
October 26, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, )
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against BlackBerry Limited, TCL Communication Ltd., TCL Communication Technology Holdings Ltd., TCL Corp., TCL Electronics Holdings Ltd., TCL King Electrical Appliances (Huizhou) Co. Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6999696.), filed by American Patents LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harrington, Zachariah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Patents LLC v. TCL Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCL Electronics Holdings Ltd.
Represented By: Natalie A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCL Corp.
Represented By: Natalie A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCL Communication Technology Holdings Ltd.
Represented By: Natalie A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCL King Electrical Appliances (Huizhou) Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Natalie A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCL Communication Ltd.
Represented By: Natalie A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BlackBerry Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Patents LLC
Represented By: Zachariah Harrington
Represented By: Matthew J Antonelli
Represented By: Christopher Ryan Pinckney
Represented By: Catherine Susan Bartles
Represented By: Larry Dean Thompson, Jr
Represented By: Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis
Represented By: Michael David Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?