Pontikis v. Wesco Aircraft Hardware Corp.
Plaintiff: Stefanos Pontikis
Defendant: Wesco Aircraft Hardware Corp.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00777
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/6/2019 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Amended Pleadings due by 3/27/2019 for Plaintiff and by 4/10/2019 for Defendant. Discovery due by 6/19/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 2/13/2019. Proposed Jury instructions/Form of Verdict due by 11/20/2019. Mediation Completion due by 4/1/2019. Designation of Mediator due by 2/18/2019. Motions to dismiss, motions for summary judgment, or other dispositive motions due by 4/10/2019. Joint Final Pretrial Order due by 11/6/2019. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/20/2018. (baf, )
December 19, 2018 Due to the Court's schedule, the 1/2/2019 Scheduling Conference is CANCELED. The Court will enter a Scheduling Order. (kkc, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ackie, Melissa)
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Stefanos Pontikis (Jones, Taneska)
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Wesco Aircraft Hardware Corp. of Defendant's Rule 26(a)(A)(1) Initial Disclosures (Miers, Kimberly)
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Rowland Gray on behalf of Wesco Aircraft Hardware Corp. (Gray, Andrew)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND ADVISORY re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Wesco Aircraft Hardware Corp. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/20/2018. (baf, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Taneska Lasha Jones on behalf of Stefanos Pontikis (Jones, Taneska)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26(f) attorney conference on or before: November 29, 2018. File joint report of attorney conference: December 13, 2018. The case is SET for a Rule 16 management conference on Wednesday, January 2, 2019, at 2:30 p.m. at the Paul Brown United States Courthouse, 101 E. PecanStreet, Sherman, Texas 75090. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/8/2018. (daj, )
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 ***ANSWER FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Wesco Aircraft Hardware Corp..(baf, )
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 ***COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT***COMPLAINT against Wesco Aircraft Hardware Corp., filed by Stefanos Pontikis.(baf, )
November 1, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
November 1, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, )
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wesco Aircraft Hardware Corp. from Denton County, case number 18-8196-367. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7008413), filed by Wesco Aircraft Hardware Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Claudette Gillis, #3 Exhibit B - Defendant's L.R. CV-81 REmoval Information, #4 Exhibit C - Certified State Court Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit D - Index of Filing in State Court Action, #6 Exhibit D-1 - Civil Case Information Sheet, #7 Exhibit D-2 - Plaintiff's Original Petition and Plaintiff's Request for Disclosure, #8 Exhibit D-3 - Civil Process Request, #9 Exhibit D-4 - Citation to Wesco Aircraft Hardware Corp., #10 Exhibit D-5 - Record/Copy Request, #11 Exhibit D-6 - Affidavit of Service, #12 Exhibit D-7 - Defendant's Original Answer)(Miers, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pontikis v. Wesco Aircraft Hardware Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stefanos Pontikis
Represented By: Mark G Lazarz
Represented By: Taneska Lasha Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesco Aircraft Hardware Corp.
Represented By: Kimberly Rives Miers
Represented By: Andrew Rowland Gray
Represented By: Melissa Jeanine Ackie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?