Gregg et al v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brian C. Gregg and Sharon H. Gregg
Defendant: Citibank, N.A. as Trustee on Behalf of the NRZ Pass-Through Trust VI, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Shelley Ortolani as Substitute Trustee, U.S. Bank Trust National Association and BCS Financial Services
Case Number: 4:2018cv00803
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Referring Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Withdrawal re #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, by Brian C. Gregg, Sharon H. Gregg. (daj, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 24 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Brian C. Gregg, Sharon H. Gregg as to #20 Order. (daj, )
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/6/2019 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Amended Pleadings due by 3/28/2019. Discovery due by 6/20/2019. Expert Witness List due by 3/14/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 2/14/2019. Jury instructions due by 11/22/2019. Mediation Completion due by 9/3/2019. Designation of Mediator due by 7/23/2019. Motions due by 4/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 1/4/2019. (daj, )
January 3, 2019 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak: Scheduling Conference called on 1/3/2019. Brian Gregg, appearing as pro se plaintiff. Daniel Pasquale Troiano for Defendant. Status conference is set for 1/4/2019 for Mr. Gregg's wife, pro se plaintiff, to state her position regarding proposed scheduling order. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Digital Recording.) (kls, )
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER. The Court sets this matter for a telephonic status conference on Friday, January 4, 2019, at 1:00 p.m.. The Court provides participants with the teleconference call-in information, as follows: ATT Toll-Free Conference Number: 877-336-1839 Access Code: 5754049, followed by #. Participants are directed to call this number no later than 12:55 p.m.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 1/3/2019. (daj, )
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. Pending before the Court is Plaintiffs' "Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction" ("Motion") [Dkt. 11], which was filed on December 7, 2018. Those Defendants who have appeared shall file a response to Plaintiffs' Motion no later than Friday, January 11, 2019, at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 12/28/2018. (baf, )
December 26, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE by Citibank, N.A. as Trustee on Behalf of the NRZ Pass-Through Trust VI, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. NON-CONSENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Troiano, Daniel)
December 21, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint, by Citibank, N.A. as Trustee on Behalf of the NRZ Pass-Through Trust VI, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc..(Troiano, Daniel)
December 14, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Brian C. Gregg, Sharon H. Gregg (daj, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 16 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Citibank, N.A. as Trustee on Behalf of the NRZ Pass-Through Trust VI, U.S. Bank Trust National Association . (Troiano, Daniel)
December 14, 2018 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Troiano, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2018: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ).
December 10, 2018 Filing 14 PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT against BCS Financial Services, Citibank, N.A. as Trustee on Behalf of the NRZ Pass-Through Trust VI, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust National Association, filed by Brian C. Gregg, Sharon H. Gregg. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(kls, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Citibank, N.A. as Trustee on Behalf of the NRZ Pass-Through Trust VI, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Troiano, Daniel)
December 7, 2018 Filing 11 Plaintiff's MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction by Brian C. Gregg, Sharon H. Gregg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit B)(daj, )
November 23, 2018 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Brian C. Gregg, Sharon H. Gregg as to #8 Order, #9 Order. (rpc, )
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26(f) attorney conference on or before: November 30, 2018. File joint report of attorney conference: December 14, 2018. The case is SET for a Rule 16 management conference January 3, 2019 at 2:00pm. in the United States Courthouse Annex, 200 N. Travis, Sherman, Texas 75090. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 11/9/2018. (daj, )
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND ADVISORY. The Court ORDERS the parties to replead as necessary to comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Court's Local Rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 11/9/2018. (daj, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Pasquale Troiano on behalf of Citibank, N.A. as Trustee on Behalf of the NRZ Pass-Through Trust VI, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Troiano, Daniel)
November 9, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Citibank, N.A. as Trustee on Behalf of the NRZ Pass-Through Trust VI, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent SPS Holding Corp. for Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.; Corporate Parent Citigroup Inc. for Citibank, N.A. as Trustee on Behalf of the NRZ Pass-Through Trust VI. (Troiano, Daniel)
November 9, 2018 Note: Pursuant to Local Rule CV 7(j), any motions pending in another federal or state court made by any party will be considered moot at the time of transfer or removal unless they are re-urged in this court. (daj, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 ***ANSWER FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Citibank, N.A. as Trustee on Behalf of the NRZ Pass-Through Trust VI, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc..(daj, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 ***AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT***COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Brian C. Gregg, Sharon H. Gregg.(daj, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 ***ORIGINAL COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT***COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Brian C. Gregg, Sharon H. Gregg.(daj, )
November 9, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. ***Consent form mailed to pro se plaintiff. (daj, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and referred to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate referral) (daj, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Citibank, N.A. as Trustee on Behalf of the NRZ Pass-Through Trust VI, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. from 429th Judicial District Court, Collin County, case number 429-05662-2018. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7020278), filed by Citibank, N.A. as Trustee on Behalf of the NRZ Pass-Through Trust VI, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Docket, #2 Ex A-1 Petition, #3 Ex A-2 Coversheet, #4 Ex A-3 Amended Petition, #5 Ex A-4 Amended Coversheet, #6 Ex A-5 TRO, #7 Ex A-6 Order, #8 Ex A-7 Request, #9 Ex A-8 Issuance, #10 Ex A-9 Issuance, #11 Ex A-10 Answer, #12 Ex B - CAD, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Civil Cover Sheet Supplement)(Danner, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregg et al v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A. as Trustee on Behalf of the NRZ Pass-Through Trust VI
Represented By: Daniel Pasquale Troiano
Represented By: Richard Dwayne Danner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Pasquale Troiano
Represented By: Richard Dwayne Danner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelley Ortolani as Substitute Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCS Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian C. Gregg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon H. Gregg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?