United States of America (IRS) v. Pruitt et al
Plaintiff: United States of America (IRS)
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Carol R. Pruitt and Robert L. Pruitt
Case Number: 4:2018cv00836
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Carol R. Pruitt, Robert L. Pruitt.(Petrocchi, Anthony)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - CLERK CANNOT TAKE ACTION - REQUESTED EXTENSION EXCEEDS 30 DAYS***Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Carol R. Pruitt, Robert L. Pruitt.( Moon, James) Modified on 12/21/2018 (daj, ).
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America (IRS). Nationstar Mortgage LLC served on 12/13/2018, answer due 1/3/2019. (Church, Holly)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America (IRS). Robert L. Pruitt served on 11/30/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. (Church, Holly)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America (IRS). Carol R. Pruitt served on 11/30/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. (Church, Holly)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (rpc, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Robert L. Pruitt. (rpc, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Carol R. Pruitt. (rpc, )
November 29, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
November 29, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America (IRS). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Church, Holly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America (IRS) v. Pruitt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America (IRS)
Represented By: Holly Michele Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol R. Pruitt
Represented By: Anthony Alan Petrocchi
Represented By: James Phillip Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Pruitt
Represented By: Anthony Alan Petrocchi
Represented By: James Phillip Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?