Reed v. The New Firewall Forward, LLC
Plaintiff: MD Kenneth Reed and Kenneth L. Reed, MD
Defendant: The New Firewall Forward, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00894
Filed: December 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for The New Firewall Forward, LLC to 2/28/2019. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
February 15, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 5, APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (baf, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The New Firewall Forward, LLC.( Hampton, George)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - FORM IS BLANK***Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The New Firewall Forward, LLC.( Hampton, George) Modified on 2/15/2019 (baf, ).
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Plaintiff's Original Complaint served on The New Firewall Forward, LLC on January 10, 2019, filed by Kenneth L. Reed, MD. (Griffith, Casey)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to The New Firewall Forward, LLC. (rpc, )
December 26, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
December 24, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
December 24, 2018 Filing 2 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Civil Cover Sheet): #1 Complaint. (Griffith, Casey) Modified on 12/26/2018 (rpc, ).
December 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7074842.), filed by Kenneth Reed.(Griffith, Casey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. The New Firewall Forward, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The New Firewall Forward, LLC
Represented By: George Leo Hampton, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MD Kenneth Reed
Represented By: Casey Lee Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth L. Reed, MD
Represented By: Ryan Timothy Funderburg
Represented By: Casey Lee Griffith
Represented By: Michael Collin Barbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?