Dahlheimer v. Bowling

Plaintiff: Lester John Dahlheimer, Jr
Defendant: Wanda L. Bowling
Case Number: 4:2019cv00022
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
0 Judge: Amos L Mazzant
1 Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 14 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Order #12 sent to Wanda L. Bowling returned marked, "RETURN TO SENDER - ATTEMTPTED-NOT KNOWN - UNABLE TO FORWARD". (daj, )
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM ADOPTING #12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. It is, therefore, ORDERED that Plaintiff Lester John Dahlheimer's Emergency Motion to Remand and Motion to Abstain [Dkt. #4 ] is GRANTED, and the above-captioned case is hereby REMANDED to the 296th Judicial District Court, Collin County, Texas for further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/26/2019. (rpc, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, re #4 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court and Motion to Abstain filed by Lester John Dahlheimer, Jr. The Court recommends that Dahlheimer's Emergency Motion to Remand and Motion to Abstain [Dkt. 4] be GRANTED, and this case be REMANDED back to the 296th Judicial District Court, Collin County, Texas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 1/25/2019. (kls, )
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Supplement re #9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Lester John Dahlheimer, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E-Mail regarding Delay of Sale)(Pierce, Elisha)
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Wanda L. Bowling as to #6 Order. (rpc, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Consolidate Complaint with 4:18-cv-00610-ALM-CAN by Wanda L. Bowling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(rpc, )
January 21, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court and Motion to Abstain filed by Lester John Dahlheimer, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order of Clarification, #2 Exhibit Citation, #3 Exhibit E-mail regarding sale)(Pierce, Elisha)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's RESPONSE to Motion re #4 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court and Motion to Abstain filed by Wanda L. Bowling. (daj, )
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR EXPEDITED RESPONSE re #4 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court and Motion to Abstain. Plaintiff Wanda Bowling shall file a response to Defendant's Emergency Motion to Remand no later than Friday, January 18, 2019, at 5:00 p.m. Any reply, if necessary, should be filed on or before Monday, January 21, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 1/14/2019. (rpc, )
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERRAL. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Local Rules of this Court for the Assignment of Matters of Magistrate Judges, the Court hereby REFERS the above-referenced case to the Hon. Christine A. Nowak for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/14/2019. (rpc, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court and Motion to Abstain by Lester John Dahlheimer, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Final Decree of Divorce, #2 Exhibit Appellate Court Mandate, #3 Exhibit Agreed Order - Enforcement, #4 Exhibit Show Cause Order, #5 Exhibit Motion to Revoke Suspension of Commitment, #6 Exhibit Order to Appear, #7 Exhibit Sale Contract, #8 Exhibit Notice of Approval of Sale Hearing, #9 Exhibit Affidavit of Receiver, #10 Exhibit Notice of Motion to Revoke Suspension, #11 Exhibit Notice of Hearing on Motion to Revoke Suspension of Commitment)(Pierce, Elisha) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/14/2019: #12 Text of Proposed Order) (rpc, ).
January 14, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #3 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court and Motion to Abstain submitted by Lester John Dahlheimer, Jr. The exhibits were not filed as separate attachements and the Motion is missing a proposed order. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court and Motion to Abstain by Lester John Dahlheimer, Jr. (Pierce, Elisha) Modified on 1/14/2019 (rpc, ).
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** APPLICATION for Sale of Real Property and Improvements against Wanda L. Bowling, filed by Lester John Dahlheimer, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(rpc, )
January 11, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number TXE100017773 (rpc, )
January 11, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
January 11, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wanda L. Bowling from 296th District Court, Collin County, case number 296-51274-2015. (Filing fee $ 400 paid, receipt no. TXE100017773), filed by Wanda L. Bowling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D - Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(rpc, ) Modified on 1/11/2019 (dlc, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dahlheimer v. Bowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanda L. Bowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lester John Dahlheimer, Jr
Represented By: Paulette Mueller
Represented By: Elisha Davis Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?