NT Logistics, Inc. v. NT Logistics, Inc., a Delaware Corporation

Plaintiff: NT Logistics, Inc.
Defendant: NT Logistics, Inc., a Delaware Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv00024
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 20 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by NT Logistics, Inc., a Delaware Corporation as to #14 Order. (rpc, )
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing and that such will be rescheduled by the Court. It is further ORDERED that the Temporary Restraining Order previously entered in this matter is hereby extended and shall remain in full force and effect until further order of the Court on Plaintiff's request for a Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/13/2019. (rpc, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing by NT Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
February 11, 2019 Filing 17 Mail Returned as Undeliverable via regular mail - "Refused - Unable to Forward." Mail sent to NT Logistics, Inc. - Order #14 . (kls, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 16 Mail Returned as Undeliverable via certified mail - "Refused - Unable to Forward." Mail sent to NT Logistics, Inc. - Order #14 . (kls, )
February 5, 2019 BOND in the amount of $ 1,000.00 posted by NT Logistics, Inc. per Order #14 . (mjc, )
February 2, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing sent via certified and regular first class mail to NT Logistics, c/o Registered Agent, Inc., 700 Lavaca Street, #1401, Austin, Texas, and to NT Logistics, c/o Principal Address, 4726 Sabero Lane, League City, Texas; re NOTICE of Hearing on Plaintiff's Request for Preliminary Injunction. Hearing set for 2/15/2019 at 3:00 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III (kls, )
February 1, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Motion Hearing held on 2/1/2019 re #7 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Emergency Amended Application For Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order)) filed by NT Logistics, Inc., #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by NT Logistics, Inc.. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (daj, )
February 1, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on Plaintiff's Request for Preliminary Injunction. Hearing set for 2/15/2019 at 3:00 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. (kls, )
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying as moot #7 Plaintiff's Emergency Amended Application for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order; granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. This Order is entered at 3:56 p.m. on the 1st day of February, 2019. This Order expires at 11:59 p.m. on the 15th day of February, 2019. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/1/2019. (kls, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NT Logistics, Inc.. (baf, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NT Logistics, Inc. (baf, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NT Logistics, Inc.. NT Logistics, Inc., a Delaware Corporation served on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/13/2019. (Siebman, Clyde)
January 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by NT Logistics, Inc. Notice of Non-Party Subpoena (Burley, Jeffrey)
January 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Jack Burley on behalf of NT Logistics, Inc. (Burley, Jeffrey)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and #7 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Emergency Amended Application For Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order). Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2019 at 02:30 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/22/2019. (rpc, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Emergency Amended Application For Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order)) by NT Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Siebman Forrest on behalf of NT Logistics, Inc. (Forrest, Elizabeth)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bryan Hillary Burg on behalf of NT Logistics, Inc. (Burg, Bryan)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Siebman, Clyde)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to NT Logistics, Inc., a Delaware Corporation. (rpc, )
January 11, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
January 11, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by NT Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint with Exhibits, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NT Logistics, Inc., a Delaware Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7093831.), filed by NT Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Chris Todd Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2- Trademark Information, #3 Exhibit 3- NT Delaware SOS Filings, #4 Exhibit 4- Curiel Information, #5 Exhibit 5- NT Delaware SOS Filings, #6 Exhibit 6- Baytown Packhouse Website, #7 Exhibit 7- Bryan Burg Declaration, #8 Exhibit 8- BisNow Article, #9 Exhibit 9- Email Dated 11-20-2018, #10 Exhibit 10- Galveston CAD, #11 Exhibit 11- Texas SOS Search, #12 Exhibit 12- Business ID Theft, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Siebman, Clyde)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NT Logistics, Inc. v. NT Logistics, Inc., a Delaware Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NT Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Represented By: Elizabeth Siebman Forrest
Represented By: Bryan Hillary Burg
Represented By: Jeffrey Jack Burley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NT Logistics, Inc., a Delaware Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?