Williams v. Whitaker et al

Plaintiff: Billy J. Williams
Defendant: Matthew Whitaker and United States Department of Justice
Case Number: 4:2019cv00085
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
0 Judge: Amos L Mazzant
1 Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's #4 Amended Complaint is deemed properly filed before the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 2/14/2019. (daj, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Billy J. Williams.(daj, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint by Billy J. Williams. (daj, )
February 7, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 6-45794. (mjc, )
February 2, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. ***Consent Form and Pro Se Guidelines sent to Plaintiff via regular first class mail. (kls, )
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Referral) (kls, )
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Justice, Matthew Whitaker, filed by Billy J. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kls, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Whitaker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?