Manley, et al v. FCA US LLC

Plaintiff: paul manley and richard manley
Defendant: fca us llc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00123
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 5/22/2019 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 5/7/2019. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/2/2019. (baf, )
March 15, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by FCA US LLC identifying Other Affiliate Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V., Other Affiliate FCA NORTH AMERICA HOLDINGS LLC for FCA US LLC. (Spezia, Roy)
March 15, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by FCA US LLC. (Spezia, Roy)
March 15, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by FCA US LLC.(Spezia, Roy)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to FCA US LLC. (baf, )
February 15, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
February 15, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against fca us llc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7143379.), filed by richard manley, paul manley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tracy, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manley, et al v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: paul manley
Represented By: E Todd Tracy
Represented By: Andrew Galen Counts
Represented By: Wendell Phillip Martens, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: richard manley
Represented By: E Todd Tracy
Represented By: Andrew Galen Counts
Represented By: Wendell Phillip Martens, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: fca us llc
Represented By: Roy Anthony Spezia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?