De La Rosa v. CKJ Transport - Energy Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Oscar De La Rosa
Defendant: CKJ Transport - Energy Services, LLC and Jonathan Kennemer
Case Number: 4:2019cv00126
Filed: February 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shelby Mishel Broaddus on behalf of All Defendants (Broaddus, Shelby)
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John LeRoy Ross on behalf of CKJ Transport - Energy Services, LLC, Jonathan Kennemer (Ross, John)
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jonathan Kennemer. Jonathan Kennemer waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (Ross, John)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CKJ Transport - Energy Services, LLC. (Ross, John)
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oscar De La Rosa. CKJ Transport - Energy Services, LLC served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019. (Scalise, Charles)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Jonathan Kennemer. (rpc, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to CKJ Transport - Energy Services, LLC. (rpc, )
February 19, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
February 18, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
February 18, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Oscar De La Rosa (Scalise, Charles)
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7143760.), filed by Oscar De La Rosa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scalise, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De La Rosa v. CKJ Transport - Energy Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar De La Rosa
Represented By: Charles L Scalise
Represented By: Daniel B. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CKJ Transport - Energy Services, LLC
Represented By: Shelby Mishel Broaddus
Represented By: John LeRoy Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Kennemer
Represented By: Shelby Mishel Broaddus
Represented By: John LeRoy Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?