Swanston et al v. Windhaven Farm Homeowners Association, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Constance Swanston and Women's Elevated Sober Living LLC
Defendant: Windhaven Farm Homeowners Association, Inc. and Kendal Reed
Case Number: 4:2019cv00151
Filed: March 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Filing 33 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Windhaven Farm Homeowners Association, Inc. for proceedings held on 03/21/2019 Civil Hearing before Judge Kimberly Priest Johnson. (Hubbard, Emileigh)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #31 Motion to Extend Deadlines. The Motion is GRANTED with respect to the deadline for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and DENIED with respect to the deadline to file objections to the Report. However, the Court will extend Plaintiffs deadline to file objections. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 4/22/2019. (rpc, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Constance Swanston, Women's Elevated Sober Living LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hunt, Richard)
April 15, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(1) and Joinder in Windhaven's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to the Colorado River Abstention Doctrine, or in Alternative, Motion to Stay by Kendal Reed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Sowder, James)
April 15, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #28 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint submitted by Windhaven Farm Homeowners Association, Inc. The Motion to Dismiss was incorrectly filed as Answer to Complaint and the proposed order does not comply with Local Rule CV-7. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) and the Colorado River Abstention Doctrine, Or In The Alternative, Motion to Stay by Windhaven Farm Homeowners Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Sowder, James)
April 15, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #27 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint submitted by Windhaven Farm Homeowners Association, Inc. The Motion to Dismiss was incorrectly filed as Answer to Complaint and the proposed order does not comply with Local Rule CV-7. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 28 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY. INCORRECT DOCKET EVENT USED*** ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Kendal Reed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Sowder, James) Modified on 4/15/2019 (rpc, ).
April 12, 2019 Filing 27 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY. INCORRECT DOCKET EVENT USED*** ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Windhaven Farm Homeowners Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Sowder, James) Modified on 4/15/2019 (rpc, ).
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. #2 ). Within fourteen (14) days after service of the magistrate judge's report, any party may serve and file written objections to the findings and recommendations of the magistrate judge. 28 U.S.C.A. 636(b)(1)(C). Additionally, because the Hearing was conducted as a hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Plaintiffs' Application for Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. #3 ) is hereby DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 4/3/2019. (rpc, )
March 28, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Kendal Reed to 4/12/2019; Windhaven Farm Homeowners Association, Inc. to 4/12/2019. 10 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 25 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Kendal Reed, Windhaven Farm Homeowners Association, Inc..( Shirley, Katrisha)
March 28, 2019 ***PLEASE DISREGARD.*** Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Kendal Reed to 5/2/2019; Windhaven Farm Homeowners Association, Inc. to 5/2/2019. 10 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, ) Modified on 3/28/2019 (rpc, ).
March 28, 2019 Filing 24 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY, SEE DKT #25 . PLEASE DISREGARD*** Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Kendal Reed, Windhaven Farm Homeowners Association, Inc..( Shirley, Katrisha) Modified on 3/28/2019 (rpc, ).
March 28, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE by Kendal Reed, Windhaven Farm Homeowners Association, Inc. re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Defendants' Notice and Supplement Regarding Plaintiffs' Application for Temporary Injunction) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Temporary Injunction Entered)(Sowder, James)
March 28, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #22 NOTICE re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Defendants' Notice and Supplement Regarding Plaintiffs' Application for Temporary Injunection) submitted by Kendal Reed, Windhaven Farm Homeowners Association, Inc. The exhibit was not filed as a separate attachment. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 22 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** NOTICE by Kendal Reed, Windhaven Farm Homeowners Association, Inc. re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Defendants' Notice and Supplement Regarding Plaintiffs' Application for Temporary Injunection) (Shirley, Katrisha) Modified on 3/28/2019 (rpc, ).
March 27, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katrisha L Shirley on behalf of All Defendants (Shirley, Katrisha)
March 27, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Logan Sowder on behalf of All Defendants (Sowder, James)
March 27, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Second Notice of Circumstances filed by Constance Swanston, Women's Elevated Sober Living LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Temporary Injunction)(Hunt, Richard)
March 26, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Notice of Circumstances filed by Constance Swanston, Women's Elevated Sober Living LLC. (Hunt, Richard)
March 25, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Brief Regarding Anti-Injunction Act filed by Kendal Reed, Windhaven Farm Homeowners Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Lease, #2 Exhibit 2 - Oxford House Reply Brief)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
March 25, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Anti-Injunction Act Briefing filed by Constance Swanston, Women's Elevated Sober Living LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Baton Rouge discussion, #2 Exhibit Lease, #3 Exhibit Lease, #4 Exhibit Baton Rouge Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit Shawn Charter, #6 Exhibit Shawn Charter, #7 Exhibit Roy Declaration, #8 Exhibit Cyprowski Declaration)(Hunt, Richard)
March 21, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson: Evidentiary Hearing on Application for TRO held on 3/21/2019. (Court Reporter Digital Recording - Plano 108. (Witnesses testimony SEALED) (ttm, )
March 20, 2019 Evidentiary Hearing set for 3/21/2019 at 09:30 AM in Ctrm 108 (Plano) before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (rpc, )
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. The evidentiary hearing on Plaintiffs' Emergency Application for Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. #3 ) set for March 18, 2019, at 1:30 p.m., is hereby reset to Thursday, March 21, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 3/18/2019. (rpc, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Constance Swanston, Women's Elevated Sober Living LLC. Kendal Reed served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Hunt, Richard)
March 18, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Constance Swanston, Women's Elevated Sober Living LLC. Windhaven Farm Homeowners Association, Inc. served on 3/12/2019, answer due 4/2/2019. (Hunt, Richard)
March 18, 2019 Filing 11 Exhibit List For Injunction Hearing by Constance Swanston, Women's Elevated Sober Living LLC.. (Hunt, Richard)
March 18, 2019 NOTICE CANCELLING Motion hearing set 3/18/19, to be reset to a later date. (ttm, )
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued as to Kendal Reed. (rpc, )
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued as to Windhaven Farm Homeowners Association, Inc. (rpc, )
March 10, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Constance Swanston, Women's Elevated Sober Living LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Oxford House v City of Baton Rouge, #2 Exhibit Oxford House v Browning)(Hunt, Richard)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #3 Motion for TRO, filed by Kendal Reed, Windhaven Farm Homeowners Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Deed, #2 Exhibit 2 - Appraisal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Amended Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Application (Dkt. #3 ) is hereby set for an evidentiary hearing before the undersigned on Monday, March 18, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall file a written response to the Application no later than Friday, March 8, 2018, at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 3/6/2019. (rpc, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kendal Reed, Windhaven Farm Homeowners Association, Inc., filed by Constance Swanston, Women's Elevated Sober Living LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Expert Report of Dr. John Majer)(Hunt, Richard)
March 4, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
March 3, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (rpc, )
March 3, 2019 Filing 4 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Civil Cover Sheet): #1 Complaint.. (Hunt, Richard) Modified on 3/4/2019 (rpc, ).
March 3, 2019 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Constance Swanston, Women's Elevated Sober Living LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Swanston Declaration, #2 Exhibit State Court Amended Petition, #3 Exhibit State Court TRO, #4 Exhibit Sublett Declaration, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hunt, Richard)
March 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Constance Swanston, Women's Elevated Sober Living LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Swanston Declaration, #2 Exhibit State Court Amended Petition, #3 Exhibit State Court TRO, #4 Exhibit Sublett Declaration, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hunt, Richard)
March 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7163068.), filed by Constance Swanston, Women's Elevated Sober Living LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Expert Report of Dr. John Majer)(Hunt, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swanston et al v. Windhaven Farm Homeowners Association, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windhaven Farm Homeowners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Emileigh Stewart Hubbard
Represented By: James Logan Sowder
Represented By: Katrisha L Shirley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendal Reed
Represented By: Emileigh Stewart Hubbard
Represented By: James Logan Sowder
Represented By: Katrisha L Shirley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Swanston
Represented By: Richard M Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Women's Elevated Sober Living LLC
Represented By: Richard M Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?