Betts v. WinCo Foods, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Lindsey Betts
Defendant: Kathy Johnson Litterer and WinCo Foods, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00152
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Kathy Johnson Litterer to 5/10/2019. (rpc, )
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Third Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Accordingly, their Second Joint Motion for Extension of the same deadline #11 is therefore DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/26/2019. (rpc, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 16 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Kathy Johnson Litterer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lindauer, Joyce)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/29/2019. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 6/13/2019 at 11:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/24/2019. (rpc, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by WinCo Foods, LLC Certificate of Interested Parties (Shardonofsky, Esteban)
April 10, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by WinCo Foods, LLC (Shardonofsky, Esteban)
April 10, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by WinCo Foods, LLC.(Shardonofsky, Esteban)
April 9, 2019 Filing 11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Kathy Johnson Litterer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lindauer, Joyce)
April 3, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Kathy Johnson Litterer to 4/10/2019. (rpc, )
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline by which Defendant Kathy Johnson Litterer must answer or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended by fourteen (14) days, up to and including April 10, 2019. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/3/2019. (rpc, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Kathy Johnson Litterer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lindauer, Joyce)
March 28, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Updated for WinCo Foods, LLC to 4/10/2019. (rpc, )
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline by which Defendant WinCo Foods, LLC must answer or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended by fourteen (14) days, up to and including April 10, 2019. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/28/2019. (rpc, )
March 27, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, /Stipulation Between Defendant, Kathy Johnson Litterer, and Plaintiff, Lindsey Betts, Regarding Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer submitted by Kathy Johnson Litterer. A Stipulation is not allowed when requesting an extension of time. A Motion or Application is required. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD*** STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, /Stipulation Between Defendant, Kathy Johnson Litterer, and Plaintiff, Lindsey Betts, Regarding Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer by Kathy Johnson Litterer. (Lindauer, Joyce) Modified on 3/27/2019 (rpc, ).
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by WinCo Foods, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shardonofsky, Esteban)
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on WinCo Foods, LLC on March 6, 2019, filed by Lindsey Betts. (Goodman, Robert)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Kathy Johnson Litterer on March 6, 2019, filed by Lindsey Betts. (Goodman, Robert)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Kathy Johnson Litterer. (rpc, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to WinCo Foods, LLC. (rpc, )
March 4, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
March 4, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7164124.), filed by Lindsey Betts. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons(es) Summons - Johnson, #3 Summons(es) Summons - WinCo)(Goodman, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Betts v. WinCo Foods, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Betts
Represented By: Robert Edward Goodman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Johnson Litterer
Represented By: Joyce W Lindauer
Represented By: Joyce Williams Lindauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WinCo Foods, LLC
Represented By: Oluwafunmito P Seton
Represented By: Esteban Shardonofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?