John Mezzalingua Associates, LLC v. Ramakrishna et al

Plaintiff: John Mezzalingua Associates, LLC
Defendant: Sudhir Ramakrishna and Mavenir Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00154
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/22/2019. (rpc, )
April 18, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION to Dismiss Action by John Mezzalingua Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wehrmann, Henry)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Plaintiff John Mezzalingua Associates, LLC's Motion to Withdraw its Emergency Application for a Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. #10 ) is hereby granted, and the Emergency Application for a Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. #6 ) is withdrawn. The hearing on Plaintiff's Emergency Application for a Temporary Restraining Order scheduled by the Court to occur on April 11, 2019, is hereby canceled. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/10/2019. (rpc, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION to Withdraw Emergency Application for TRO by John Mezzalingua Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wehrmann, Henry) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/10/2019) (rpc, ).
April 9, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Mezzalingua Associates, LLC. Sudhir Ramakrishna waiver sent on 3/12/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Wehrmann, Henry)
April 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by John Mezzalingua Associates, LLC Certificate of Service of Emergency Application for Temporary Restraining Order (Wehrmann, Henry)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #6 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. The Court hereby sets this matter for hearing on Thursday, April 11, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/8/2019. (rpc, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by John Mezzalingua Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Farooq Khan, PhD, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Christopher M. Militello, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Temporary Restraining Order)(Wehrmann, Henry)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Mezzalingua Associates, LLC. Mavenir Systems, Inc. waiver sent on 3/6/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s) Cover Letter)(Wehrmann, Henry)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Mavenir Systems, Inc. (rpc, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Sudhir Ramakrishna. (rpc, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by John Mezzalingua Associates, LLC (Wehrmann, Henry)
March 5, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
March 5, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7165575.), filed by John Mezzalingua Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Confidentiality Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet)(Wehrmann, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Mezzalingua Associates, LLC v. Ramakrishna et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sudhir Ramakrishna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mavenir Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Mezzalingua Associates, LLC
Represented By: Robert John Smith
Represented By: Henry Scott Wehrmann
Represented By: Christopher Michael Militello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?