Leak v. Walmart Inc.

Plaintiff: Sharteia Leak
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00220
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/31/2020 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Amended Pleadings due by 8/14/2019. Discovery due by 11/11/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 7/3/2019. Jury instructions due by 3/17/2020. Mediation Completion due by 10/28/2019. Designation of Mediator due by 5/29/2019, Motions due by 11/12/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 5/31/2019. (rpc, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson: Rule 16 Management Conference held on 5/22/2019. (Court Reporter Digital Recording - Plano 108.) (ttm, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Johnathan Bush on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bush, Charles)
April 29, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rhine, Bevan)
April 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ramona Martinez on behalf of Walmart Inc. (Martinez, Ramona)
April 26, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the REPORT OF RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING submitted - DOCUMENT #8 - DOCUMENT IS FILED USING THE LOGIN AND PASSWORD OF AN ATTORNEY WHO IS NOT AN ATTORNEY OF RECORD IN THIS CASE. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 8 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Rhine, Bevan) Modified on 4/26/2019 (baf, ).
April 22, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR BY CLERK. Document # 7, ORDER. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (baf, )
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR***ORDER. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/22/2019. (baf, ) Modified on 4/22/2019 (baf, ).
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Sharteia Leak (Bush, Charles)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 5/22/2019 at 1:30 PM in Ctrm 108 (Plano) before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 4/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 3/25/2019. (baf, )
March 22, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 ***AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT***AMENDED COMPLAINT against Walmart Inc., filed by Sharteia Leak.(baf, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 ***ANSWER FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Walmart Inc..(baf, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 ***COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT***COMPLAINT against Walmart Inc., filed by Sharteia Leak.(baf, )
March 22, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (baf, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Inc. d/b/a Walmart from 211th District Court, Denton County, case number 19-0407-211. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7192063), filed by Walmart Inc. d/b/a Walmart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A index, #2 Exhibit B state docket, #3 Exhibit C state pldgs, #4 Exhibit D party info, #5 Exhibit E discl stmt, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martinez, Ramona)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leak v. Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Ramona Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharteia Leak
Represented By: Amber Michelle Chambers
Represented By: Charles Johnathan Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?