Cunningham v. Quogen, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Craig Cunningham
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company, Justin Elenburg, Digital Thrive, LLC, National Congress of Employers, Inc., GoHealth, LLC, Tashanna Wagner, Med-Sense Guaranteed Association, Inc., American Services Insurance Agency, LLC, American Financial Security Life Insurance Company, Quogen, LLC, Michael Cartwright, John/Jane Does 1-4 and Jennifer Mansfield
Case Number: 4:2019cv00237
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Referring Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice is GRANTED. It is further, ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that all claims between Plaintiff and the Defendants that were or could have been brought in this action are dismissed with prejudice to the re-filing of same. It is further, ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that all relief not granted herein is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/3/2019. (daj, )
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying as moot #15 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 5/3/2019. (daj, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 27 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Craig Cunningham as to #16 Order. (daj, )
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. ORDERED that the Rule 16 management conference set for Tuesday, June 11, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. is hereby CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 5/1/2019. (daj, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Craig Cunningham. (rpc, )
April 30, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for American Services Insurance Agency, LLC to 5/10/2019. 17 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( daj, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 23 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re American Services Insurance Agency, LLC.( Rial, James)
April 30, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding Document #22 submitted by American Services Insurance Agency, LLC. Filing does not comply with Local Rule CV-12. Correction should be made by one business day. (daj, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 22 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - ATTORNEY MUST FILE UNOPPOSED APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT***Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by American Services Insurance Agency, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rial, James) Modified on 4/30/2019 (daj, ).
April 24, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Garry W. O'Donnell on behalf of American Services Insurance Agency, LLC, Tashanna Wagner. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7241871. (O'Donnell, Garry)
April 24, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Hamilton Rial, III on behalf of Tashanna Wagner (Rial, James)
April 24, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Hamilton Rial, III on behalf of American Services Insurance Agency, LLC (Rial, James)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. ORDERED that the Court will conduct the Rule 16 management conference on Tuesday, June 11, 2019 at 2:00 p.m.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 4/23/2019. (daj, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Management Conference by Med-Sense Guaranteed Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Elrod, John)
April 22, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Rule 16 Management Conference set for 6/3/2019 at 2:00 PM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (baf, )
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 6/3/2019 at 2:00 PM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before Magistrate Christine A. Nowak. Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 5/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 4/22/2019. (baf, )
April 19, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Med-Sense Guaranteed Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Ronald Kotowski, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint filed in the M.D. Tenn.)(Elrod, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/22/2019: #3 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ).
April 1, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 6-46616. (mjc, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Issued as to Tashanna Wagner. (daj, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Issued as to Quogen, LLC. (daj, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued as to National Congress of Employers, Inc.. (daj, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued as to Michael Cartwright. (daj, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued as to Med-Sense Guaranteed Association, Inc.. (daj, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued as to Justin Elenburg. (daj, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to Jennifer Mansfield. (daj, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to GoHealth, LLC. (daj, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Federal Insurance Company. (daj, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Digital Thrive, LLC. (daj, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to American Services Insurance Agency, LLC. (daj, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to American Financial Security Life Insurance Company. (daj, )
March 27, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. ***Consent form mailed to plaintiff. (daj, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and referred to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate referral) (daj, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Craig Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(daj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. Quogen, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Elenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digital Thrive, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Congress of Employers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoHealth, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tashanna Wagner
Represented By: Garry W. O'Donnell
Represented By: James Hamilton Rial, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Med-Sense Guaranteed Association, Inc.
Represented By: John D Elrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Services Insurance Agency, LLC
Represented By: Garry W. O'Donnell
Represented By: James Hamilton Rial, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Financial Security Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quogen, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cartwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Does 1-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Mansfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?