Albert et al v. CNH Industrial America LLC
Plaintiff: Logan Albert, Joyce Albert, Herbert C. Albert and Karen Albert
Defendant: CNH America LLC, CNH Industrial America, LLC and CNH Industrial America LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00323
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by CNH Industrial America LLC.(Trent, T)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Trent, T) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2019: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ).
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by CNH Industrial America LLC RULE 26(a)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Trent, T)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against All Defendants, filed by Karen Albert.(Goetzmann, Stephen)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT of All Complainants against All Defendants, filed by Karen Albert.(Goetzmann, Stephen)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Stephen R. Goetzmann on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7279669. (Goetzmann, Stephen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/29/2019: #1 Sealed Attachment) (jmv, ).
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/26/2019. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 01:30 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/22/2019. (rpc, )
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND ADVISORY re #1 Notice of Removal. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/15/2019. (baf, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Tamara Brock Segal on behalf of Herbert C. Albert, Joyce Albert, Karen Albert, Logan Albert. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7259863. (Segal, Tamara)
May 3, 2019 Notified Attorney for Plaintiffs', Stephen Goetzmann, Per GO 04-12, this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. ***ATTORNEY NOT ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN OUR COURT - ATTORNEY ADMITTANCE LETTER EMAILED TO STEPHEN GOETZMANN*** (baf, )
May 3, 2019 Notified Attorney for Plaintiffs', Tamara Brock Segal, Per GO 04-12, this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. ***ATTORNEY NOT ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN OUR COURT - ATTORNEY ADMITTANCE LETTER EMAILED TO TAMARA BROCK SEGAL*** (baf, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 ***ANSWER FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #2 Complaint by CNH America LLC, CNH Industrial America, LLC.(baf, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 ***COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT***COMPLAINT against CNH America LLC, CNH Industrial America, LLC, filed by Karen Albert, Herbert C. Albert, Joyce Albert, Logan Albert.(baf, )
May 3, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
May 3, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CNH Industrial America LLC from 367th Judicial Disctrict Court of Denton County, TX, case number 19-3117-367. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7253334), filed by CNH Industrial America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant CNH Industrial's Original Answer, #3 Exhibit D - Index of Matters Being Filed, #4 Exhibit E - List of All Counsel of Record, #5 Civil Cover Sheet (Exhibit F), #6 Exhibit G - State Court Docket Sheet, #7 Exhibit H - State Court Filings, #8 Exhibit I - Plaintiffs' 4th Amended Petition in re Karen Albert, et al v John Rellos, et al)(Trent, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albert et al v. CNH Industrial America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Logan Albert
Represented By: Stephen R. Goetzmann
Represented By: Tamara Brock Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Albert
Represented By: Stephen R. Goetzmann
Represented By: Tamara Brock Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert C. Albert
Represented By: Stephen R. Goetzmann
Represented By: Tamara Brock Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Albert
Represented By: Stephen R. Goetzmann
Represented By: Tamara Brock Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNH America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNH Industrial America, LLC
Represented By: T Christopher Trent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNH Industrial America LLC
Represented By: T Christopher Trent
Represented By: Raphael Charles Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?