Kim et al v. Honda Canada, Inc.
Plaintiff: Su Min Kim and Ji Hun Kim
Defendant: Honda Canada, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00332
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/6/2019. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 8/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/1/2019. (rpc, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Honda Canada, Inc..(Hawkins, Jeffrey)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Honda Canada, Inc. (rpc, )
May 9, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR - SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED SHOULD BE EMAILED TO THE CLERK. Document # 2, NOTICE. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (baf, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 ***PLEASE DISREGARD***NOTICE by Ji Hun Kim, Su Min Kim re #1 Complaint Notice of Request for Summons to Clerk (Nguyen, T) Modified on 5/9/2019 (baf, ).
May 7, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
May 7, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Honda Canada, Inc. d/b/a Honda of Canada Mfg. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7257289.), filed by Su Min Kim, Ji Hun Kim. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nguyen, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kim et al v. Honda Canada, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Su Min Kim
Represented By: Windle Turley
Represented By: T Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ji Hun Kim
Represented By: Windle Turley
Represented By: T Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda Canada, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Lin Cavner Buntz
Represented By: Jeffrey S Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?