Hughes v. The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Peggy Hughes
Defendant: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company and Ronnie Daly
Case Number: 4:2019cv00343
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 16 Defendant Ronnie Daly's ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Ronnie Daly.(Lewis, William)
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of State Court Return of Service on Defendant Ronnie Daly filed by Peggy Hughes. (Klein, Hunter)
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of State Court Return of Service on Defendant The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company filed by Peggy Hughes. (Klein, Hunter)
July 3, 2019 The Court hereby CANCELS the July 11, 2019 Scheduling Conference; the Court will enter a Scheduling Order. (tls)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 DEFENDANT THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION) by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company.(Lewis, William)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Puckett, Alissa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2019: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ).
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ronnie Daly, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, filed by Peggy Hughes.(Klein, Hunter)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION Preclude Attorneys Fees Under Section 542A.007 and Brief in Support Thereof filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B (Tipton Resp), #2 Exhibit C (October Estimate))(Lewis, William)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION Preclude Attorneys Fees Under Section 542A.007 and Brief in Support Thereof filed by Peggy Hughes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Klein, Hunter)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/26/2019. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 02:00 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/22/2019. (rpc, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION Preclude Attorneys Fees Under Section 542A.007 and Brief in Support Thereof by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration, #2 Exhibit A1 - Policy, #3 Exhibit A2 - Check, #4 Exhibit A3 - Letter, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewis, William)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND ADVISORY re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/15/2019. (baf, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #4 Petition by Ronnie Daly, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company.(rpc, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** PETITION against Ronnie Daly, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, filed by Peggy Hughes.(rpc, )
May 10, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
May 10, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alissa Kylene Puckett on behalf of The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company (Puckett, Alissa)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Puckett, Alissa)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company from 401st District Court of Collin County, case number 401-01946-2019. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7263521), filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (List of Attorneys), #2 Exhibit B (Certified Docket), #3 Exhibit C (State Court File), #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lewis, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes v. The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Alissa Kylene Puckett
Represented By: William Lance Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Daly
Represented By: Alissa Kylene Puckett
Represented By: William Lance Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Hughes
Represented By: Hunter Milam Klein
Represented By: Robert Dale Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?