Thompson v. Durham School Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Gina Thompson
Defendant: Shawnta Lang and National Express, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00349
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gina Thompson. National Express, LLC served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Goodman, Robert)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gina Thompson. Shawnta Lang served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Goodman, Robert)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gina Thompson.(Goodman, Robert)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to National Express, LLC.(General Manager, Dallas Charter 3017 - Shawnta Lang) (baf, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to National Express, LLC. (baf, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Shawnta Lang. (baf, )
May 13, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
May 13, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (baf, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Express, LLC dba Durham School Services, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7265180.), filed by Gina Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goodman, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Durham School Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawnta Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Express, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Thompson
Represented By: Robert Edward Goodman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?