Goodman v. Blount International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lee Goodman
Defendant: Blount International, Inc. and Tractor Supply Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00479
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Sean D Jordan
2 Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint by Tractor Supply Company.(Sayles, Robert)
August 28, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint by Blount International, Inc..(Sayles, Robert)
August 28, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 17, Notice of Change of Address. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (daj, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 17 ***DISREGARD ENTRY - FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY***NOTICE of Change of Address by Donald Allan Ferrill (Ferrill, Donald) Modified on 8/28/2019 (daj, ).
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL CASES. It is hereby ORDERED that this civil action is transferred to the Honorable Sean D. Jordan, effective immediately. Upon transfer, any pretrial referral to a Magistrate Judge is REVOKED except in Social Security cases, Pro Se Non-Prisoner/Habeas cases, and mortgage cases, where the pretrial referral will stay in place. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by United States District Judge Amos L. Mazzant. District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson no longer assigned to the case. (kls, )
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2020 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Amended Pleadings due by 11/6/2019 for Plaintiff and by 11/20/2019 for Defendant. Discovery due by 1/29/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 9/25/2019. Proposed Jury instructions/Form of Verdict due by 6/22/2020. Mediation Completion due by 4/13/2020. Designation of Mediator due by 3/2/2020. Motions to dismiss, motions for summary judgment, or other dispositive motions due by 2/17/2020. Joint Final Pretrial Order due by 6/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 8/16/2019. (baf, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson: Rule 16 Management Conference held on 8/14/2019. (Court Reporter Digital Recording - Plano 108.) (ttm, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(Sayles, Robert)
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lee Goodman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ferrill, Donald)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Blount International, Inc., Tractor Supply Company (Sayles, Robert)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Lee Goodman re #9 Order,, Set Hearings,, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, of Written Discovery (Ferrill, Donald)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 8/14/2019 at 1:30 PM in Ctrm 108 (Plano) before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 8/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 7/9/2019. (baf, )
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND ADVISORY re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Blount International, Inc., Tractor Supply Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 7/9/2019. (baf, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 ***ANSWER FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #5 Complaint by Tractor Supply Company.(baf, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 ***ANSWER FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #5 Complaint by Blount International, Inc..(baf, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 ***COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT***COMPLAINT against Blount International, Inc., Tractor Supply Company, filed by Lee Goodman.(baf, )
July 2, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
July 2, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (baf, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Alan Sayles on behalf of Blount International, Inc., Tractor Supply Company (Sayles, Richard)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tractor Supply Company (Sayles, Robert)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Blount International, Inc. (Sayles, Robert)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants Blount International, Inc. and Tractor Supply Company from 462nd District Court, case number 19-4731-462. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7333546), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sayles, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodman v. Blount International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blount International, Inc.
Represented By: Robert L Sayles
Represented By: Richard Alan Sayles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tractor Supply Company
Represented By: Robert L Sayles
Represented By: Richard Alan Sayles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Goodman
Represented By: Donald Allan Ferrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?