Chelsea Yacht Services, LLC v. Brunswick Corporation
Plaintiff: Chelsea Yacht Services, LLC
Defendant: Brunswick Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv00481
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. The August 20, 2019 scheduling conference is hereby CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/15/2019. (rpc, )
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/15/2019. (rpc, )
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/5/2020 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2020., Discovery due by 2/11/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 9/13/2019., Mediation Completion due by 11/1/2019., Motions due by 3/10/2020., Proposed Findings of Fact due by 4/21/2020., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/21/2020., Bench Trial set for 5/18/2020 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/15/2019. (rpc, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION Entry of Proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Brunswick Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Docket Control Order, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Discovery Order)(Fuller, Stacey)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Virgil Pipal on behalf of Chelsea Yacht Services, LLC (Pipal, David)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Brunswick Corporation . (Mohrman, Joel)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. This case is set for a scheduling conference in Texarkana, Texas on August 20, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/25/2019. (rpc, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joel W Mohrman on behalf of Brunswick Corporation (Mohrman, Joel)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #3 Petition by Brunswick Corporation.(rpc, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** PETITION against Brunswick Corporation, filed by Chelsea Yacht Services, LLC.(rpc, )
July 3, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
July 2, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (rpc, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Brunswick Corporation Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Parties (Mohrman, Joel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Brunswick Corporation from 367th Judicial District Court, Denton County, Texas, case number 19-5011-367. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7334264), filed by Brunswick Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fuller, Stacey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chelsea Yacht Services, LLC v. Brunswick Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brunswick Corporation
Represented By: Stacey Louise Fuller
Represented By: Joel W Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Yacht Services, LLC
Represented By: David Virgil Pipal
Represented By: Robert Matthew Lovein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?