UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Fleming et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Collin County District Clerk and Carlton W. Fleming
Case Number: 4:2019cv00482
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Referring Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL CASES. It is hereby ORDERED that this civil action is transferred to the Honorable Sean D. Jordan, effective immediately. Upon transfer, any pretrial referral to a Magistrate Judge is REVOKED except in Social Security cases, Pro Se Non-Prisoner/Habeas cases, and mortgage cases, where the pretrial referral will stay in place. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by United States District Judge Amos L. Mazzant. District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III no longer assigned to the case. (kls, )
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/10/2019. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 02:00 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/6/2019. (rpc, )
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Dismiss Disclaiming Defendant Collin County District Clerk as a Party to this Proceeding. It is further ORDERED that Defendant Collin County District Clerk is dismissed from this case and excused from all future proceedings related to this case. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/1/2019. (rpc, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Disclaiming Defendant Collin County District Clerk as a Party to This Proceeding by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Herrin, Thomas) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/31/2019) (rpc, ).
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Collin County District Clerk Disclaimer of Interest (Davis, Robert)
July 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Carlton W. Fleming Certificate of Interested Parties (Coffin, David)
July 28, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Carlton W. Fleming.(Coffin, David)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Collin County District Clerk served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. (Herrin, Thomas)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Carlton W. Fleming served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Herrin, Thomas)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Collin County District Clerk. (rpc, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Carlton W. Fleming. (rpc, )
July 3, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
July 3, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (United State's Certificate of Interested Parties) (Herrin, Thomas)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Collin County District Clerk, Carlton W. Fleming, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons(es) for Carlton W. Fleming, #3 Summons(es) for Collin County District Clerk)(Herrin, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Fleming et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collin County District Clerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlton W. Fleming
Represented By: David Brandon Coffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Thomas Michael Herrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?