Stiles v. H-E-B, LP
Plaintiff: Sharidan L. Stiles
Defendant: H-E-B, LP
Case Number: 4:2019cv00489
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL CASES. It is hereby ORDERED that this civil action is transferred to the Honorable Sean D. Jordan, effective immediately. Upon transfer, any pretrial referral to a Magistrate Judge is REVOKED except in Social Security cases, Pro Se Non-Prisoner/Habeas cases, and mortgage cases, where the pretrial referral will stay in place. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by United States District Judge Amos L. Mazzant. District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III no longer assigned to the case. (kls, )
August 2, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for H-E-B, LP to 9/4/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re H-E-B, LP.( Flannery, Elizabeth)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sharidan L. Stiles. H-E-B, LP served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Dunne, Brian)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to H-E-B, LP. (daj, )
July 5, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (daj, )
July 5, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (daj, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Dunne, Brian)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against H-E-B, LP ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7336944.), filed by Sharidan L. Stiles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 9,108,329, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 9,707,689, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dunne, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stiles v. H-E-B, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H-E-B, LP
Represented By: Elizabeth Durham Flannery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharidan L. Stiles
Represented By: Brian James Dunne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?