Thompson v. Tractor Supply Company et al
Plaintiff: Sandra Thompson
Defendant: Tractor Supply Company of Texas LP, Tractor Supply Company and Tractor Supply Company of Texas, L.P.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00491
Filed: July 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. This case is set for a scheduling conference in Texarkana, Texas on September 18, 2019 at 10 a.m. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/29/2019. (rpc, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 (Corrected) Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint to correct typographical error by Tractor Supply Company, Tractor Supply Company of Texas, L.P..(Baker, Jana)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. SEE DKT #8 *** Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Tractor Supply Company, Tractor Supply Company of Texas, L.P..(Baker, Jana) Modified on 7/30/2019 (rpc, ).
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sandra Thompson. Tractor Supply Company served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Forsman, Wade)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sandra Thompson. Tractor Supply Company of Texas, L.P. served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Forsman, Wade)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Tractor Supply Company of Texas, L.P.(rpc, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Tractor Supply Company. (rpc, )
July 5, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
July 4, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (rpc, )
July 4, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sandra Thompson (Forsman, Wade)
July 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7337025.), filed by Sandra Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Forsman, Wade)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Tractor Supply Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tractor Supply Company of Texas LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tractor Supply Company
Represented By: Jana Scott Baker
Represented By: Matthew Paul Gizzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tractor Supply Company of Texas, L.P.
Represented By: Jana Scott Baker
Represented By: Matthew Paul Gizzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Thompson
Represented By: Wade Arnold Forsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?