Alagood Cartwright Burke PC v. United States of America, Internal Revenue Service, et al
Plaintiff: Alagood Cartwright Burke PC
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service, Joseph D Brown, John Casey Blythe, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Phil Williams and United States of America, Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 4:2019cv00499
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26:7609
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. The Court REFERS the above-styled and numbered civil action to United States Magistrate Judge Kimberly C. Priest Johnson to conduct all pretrial proceedings in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/19/2019. (baf, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alagood Cartwright Burke PC. (Cartwright, Brian)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alagood Cartwright Burke PC. (Cartwright, Brian)
July 17, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED submitted DOCUMENT #4 - THE COMPLETED TWO PAGE SUMMONS FORM MUST BE FILED TO FILE A RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
July 17, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED submitted DOCUMENT #3 - THE COMPLETED TWO PAGE SUMMONS MUST BE FILED TO FILE A RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alagood Cartwright Burke PC. Joseph D Brown served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Cartwright, Brian) Modified on 7/17/2019 (baf, ).
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alagood Cartwright Burke PC. United States of America, Internal Revenue Service served on 7/12/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Cartwright, Brian) Modified on 7/17/2019 (baf, ). Modified on 7/17/2019 (baf, ).
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to United States of America, Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(baf, )
July 9, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
July 9, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (baf, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Petition to Quash IRS Third-Party Summons against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7341678.), filed by Alagood Cartwright Burke PC.(Cartwright, Brian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mjc, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/10/2019: #2 Exhibit 1) (baf, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alagood Cartwright Burke PC v. United States of America, Internal Revenue Service, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph D Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Casey Blythe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America, Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alagood Cartwright Burke PC
Represented By: Brian Thomas Cartwright
Represented By: Richard Scott Alagood
Represented By: Samuel Baynton Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?