Haag Engineering Co. v. Advanced-Wholesale LLC et al
Plaintiff: Haag Engineering Co.
Defendant: Advanced-Wholesale LLC and Nik Newgard
Case Number: 4:2019cv00575
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Referring Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION Entry of Consent Final Judgment and Order of Permanent Injunction by Haag Engineering Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sowder, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2019: #2 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ).
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL CASES. It is hereby ORDERED that this civil action is transferred to the Honorable Sean D. Jordan, effective immediately. Upon transfer, any pretrial referral to a Magistrate Judge is REVOKED except in Social Security cases, Pro Se Non-Prisoner/Habeas cases, and mortgage cases, where the pretrial referral will stay in place. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by United States District Judge Amos L. Mazzant. District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III no longer assigned to the case. (kls, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Haag Engineering Co.. (Sowder, James)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Haag Engineering Co.. (Sowder, James)
August 15, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED submitted DOCUMENT #8 AND #9 - INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT - THE TWO PAGE SUMMONS FORM MUST BE FILED. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Haag Engineering Co.. Advanced-Wholesale LLC served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. (Sowder, James) Modified on 8/15/2019 (baf, ).
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Haag Engineering Co.. Nik Newgard served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. (Sowder, James) Modified on 8/15/2019 (baf, ).
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to Advanced-Wholesale LLC. (baf, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Nik Newgard. (baf, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Filing of Copyright Form (AO 121). AO 121 mailed to the Register of Copyrights. (Sowder, James)
July 31, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
July 31, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, )
July 31, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the COMPLAINT submitted DOCUMENT #3 - EXHIBITS ARE NOT PROPERLY ATTACHED AND ARE WITHIN THE MAIN DOCUMENT. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
July 31, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR - MAIN DOCUMENT #1 IS DEFICIENT. Document # 2, ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS TO MAIN DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (baf, )
July 31, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the COMPLIANT submitted DOCUMENT #1 - DOCUMENT IS NOT SIGNED BY THE ATTORNEY. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Haag Engineering Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sowder, James)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Haag Engineering Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sowder, James) Modified on 7/31/2019 (baf, ).
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - MAIN DOCUMENT IS DEFICIENT***Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Complaint.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H)(Sowder, James) Modified on 7/31/2019 (baf, ).
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7372564.), filed by Haag Engineering Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sowder, James) Modified on 7/31/2019 (baf, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haag Engineering Co. v. Advanced-Wholesale LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced-Wholesale LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nik Newgard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haag Engineering Co.
Represented By: James Logan Sowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?