Loeb-Defever et al v. Strategic Construction, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Loeb Architects, LLC and Zelma M Loeb-Defever
Defendant: Strategic Construction, Ltd. d/b/a FCI Multi-Family, Grace Management, Inc., Ted Trout Architects, Ltd., Mako, LLC d/b/a Padua Realty Co., John Doe or Jane Doe, as Representative of the Estate of Whitson B. Etheridge, II, W&P I Holdings, Inc., Antonio Padua, Woodhaven Inmobilia, Ltd., Partin Investments, LLC, Robert Partin, Padua Investments, Ltd., Texas Senior Living Group, LLC, Timothy G Dixon, Sovereign Builders Group, Ltd. d/b/a FCI Multi-Family Builders, FCI Multi-Family Holdings, LLC, Texas Senior Living Operator, LLC, Bratten Inmobilia, LLC, Propero Conroe, LLC, Inmobilia 2000, LLC, Cottages at Woodhaven Village, Ltd., Luisfina Corporation, Propero Seniors Housing Fund, LLC, Texas Senior Living Manager, LLC, CPF Living Communities II-Woodhaven, LLC, CPF Living Communities II Acquisitions, LLC, Applied Architectural Products, Inc., Francisco Padua, Alejandro Padua, FCI Multi Family GP, LLC, Mako, LLC, Sovereign Builders Group, Ltd., Strategic Construction, Ltd. and W&P 1 Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00578
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Counsel are advised that the Court has not opted out of this court's Local Rules concerning courtesy copies; therefore, Counsel are asked to comply with Local Rule CV-5(a)(9) and Local Rule CV-10(b) with respect to sending courtesy copies to Judge Mazzant. Please send copies of pleadings that exceed 20 pages to Judge Mazzant's chambers, and please use tabs and dividers for exhibits. (tls)
September 20, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue or, In the Alternative, Motion to Transfer by Applied Architectural Products, Inc., Bratten Inmobilia, LLC, CPF Living Communities II Acquisitions, LLC, CPF Living Communities II-Woodhaven, LLC, Cottages at Woodhaven Village, Ltd., Timothy G Dixon, FCI Multi Family GP, LLC, FCI Multi-Family Holdings, LLC, Grace Management, Inc., Inmobilia 2000, LLC, Luisfina Corporation, Mako, LLC, Alejandro Padua, Antonio Padua, Francisco Padua, Padua Investments, Ltd., Robert Partin, Partin Investments, LLC, Propero Conroe, LLC, Propero Seniors Housing Fund, LLC, Sovereign Builders Group, Ltd., Strategic Construction, Ltd., Ted Trout Architects, Ltd., Texas Senior Living Group, LLC, Texas Senior Living Manager, LLC, Texas Senior Living Operator, LLC, W&P 1 Holdings, Inc., Woodhaven Inmobilia, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Padua Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2-Trout Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3-Propero Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4-CPF Declaration, #5 Exhibit 5-Grace Declaration, #6 Exhibit 6-Partin Declaration, #7 Exhibit 7-Dixon Declaration)(Mitchell, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2019: #8 Text of Proposed Order) (rpc, ).
September 4, 2019 Case Reassigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER OF RECUSAL. The undersigned judge hereby recuses himself from the above-titled and numbered cause. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 9/4/2019. (rpc, )
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL CASES. It is hereby ORDERED that this civil action is transferred to the Honorable Sean D. Jordan, effective immediately. Upon transfer, any pretrial referral to a Magistrate Judge is REVOKED except in Social Security cases, Pro Se Non-Prisoner/Habeas cases, and mortgage cases, where the pretrial referral will stay in place. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by United States District Judge Amos L. Mazzant. District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III no longer assigned to the case. (kls, )
August 23, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Ted Trout Architects, Ltd. to 9/20/2019. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
August 23, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Propero Seniors Housing Fund, LLC to 9/20/2019. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
August 23, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Propero Conroe, LLC to 9/20/2019. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
August 23, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Grace Management, Inc. to 9/20/2019. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
August 23, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for CPF Living Communities II-Woodhaven, LLC to 9/20/2019. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
August 23, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for CPF Living Communities II Acquisitions, LLC to 9/20/2019. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
August 23, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for W&P 1 Holdings, Inc. to 9/20/2019. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
August 23, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Strategic Construction, Ltd. to 9/20/2019. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
August 23, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Sovereign Builders Group, Ltd. to 9/20/2019. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
August 23, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Robert Partin to 9/20/2019. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
August 23, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Partin Investments, LLC to 9/20/2019. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
August 23, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for FCI Multi-Family Holdings, LLC to 9/20/2019. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
August 23, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for FCI Multi Family GP, LLC to 9/20/2019. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
August 23, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Timothy G Dixon to 9/20/2019. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
August 23, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Applied Architectural Products, Inc. to 9/20/2019. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 60 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Ted Trout Architects, Ltd..( Mangrum, Jessica)
August 23, 2019 Filing 59 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Propero Seniors Housing Fund, LLC.( Latham, Robert)
August 23, 2019 Filing 58 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Propero Conroe, LLC.( Latham, Robert)
August 23, 2019 Filing 57 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Grace Management, Inc..( Latham, Robert)
August 23, 2019 Filing 56 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CPF Living Communities II-Woodhaven, LLC.( Latham, Robert)
August 23, 2019 Filing 55 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CPF Living Communities II Acquisitions, LLC.( Latham, Robert)
August 22, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Woodhaven Inmobilia, Ltd. to 9/20/2019. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
August 22, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Texas Senior Living Operator, LLC to 9/20/2019. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
August 22, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Texas Senior Living Manager, LLC to 9/20/2019. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
August 22, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Texas Senior Living Group, LLC to 9/20/2019. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
August 22, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Padua Investments, Ltd. to 9/20/2019. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
August 22, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Mako, LLC to 9/20/2019. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
August 22, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Luisfina Corporation to 9/20/2019. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
August 22, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Inmobilia 2000, LLC to 9/20/2019. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
August 22, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Francisco Padua to 9/20/2019. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
August 22, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Cottages at Woodhaven Village, Ltd. to 9/20/2019. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
August 22, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Bratten Inmobilia, LLC to 9/20/2019. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
August 22, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Antonio Padua to 9/20/2019. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
August 22, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Alejandro Padua to 9/20/2019. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 54 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re W&P 1 Holdings, Inc..( Blanton, Patrick)
August 22, 2019 Filing 53 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Strategic Construction, Ltd..( Blanton, Patrick)
August 22, 2019 Filing 52 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sovereign Builders Group, Ltd..( Blanton, Patrick)
August 22, 2019 Filing 51 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Robert Partin.( Blanton, Patrick)
August 22, 2019 Filing 50 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Partin Investments, LLC.( Blanton, Patrick)
August 22, 2019 Filing 49 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re FCI Multi-Family Holdings, LLC.( Blanton, Patrick)
August 22, 2019 Filing 48 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re FCI Multi Family GP, LLC.( Blanton, Patrick)
August 22, 2019 Filing 47 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Timothy G Dixon.( Blanton, Patrick)
August 22, 2019 Filing 46 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Applied Architectural Products, Inc..( Blanton, Patrick)
August 22, 2019 Filing 45 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint re Woodhaven Inmobilia, Ltd..( Mitchell, Paul)
August 22, 2019 Filing 44 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint re Texas Senior Living Operator, LLC.( Mitchell, Paul)
August 22, 2019 Filing 43 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint re Texas Senior Living Manager, LLC.( Mitchell, Paul)
August 22, 2019 Filing 42 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint re Texas Senior Living Group, LLC.( Mitchell, Paul)
August 22, 2019 Filing 41 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint re Padua Investments, Ltd..( Mitchell, Paul)
August 22, 2019 Filing 40 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint re Mako, LLC.( Mitchell, Paul)
August 22, 2019 Filing 39 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint re Luisfina Corporation.( Mitchell, Paul)
August 22, 2019 Filing 38 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint re Inmobilia 2000, LLC.( Mitchell, Paul)
August 22, 2019 Filing 37 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint re Francisco Padua.( Mitchell, Paul)
August 22, 2019 Filing 36 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint re Cottages at Woodhaven Village, Ltd..( Mitchell, Paul)
August 22, 2019 Filing 35 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint re Bratten Inmobilia, LLC.( Mitchell, Paul)
August 22, 2019 Filing 34 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint re Antonio Padua.( Mitchell, Paul)
August 22, 2019 Filing 33 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint re Alejandro Padua.( Mitchell, Paul)
August 9, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #31 and #32 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service submitted by Loeb Architects, LLC, Zelma M Loeb-Defever. The documents should be filed using event Summons Returned Executed. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 32 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY. INCORRECT DOCKET EVENT USED*** AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Timothy Dixon; Sovereign Builders; Mako LLC; Applied Architectural Products; Antonio Padua on 08/05/2019, filed by Loeb Architects, LLC, Zelma M Loeb-Defever. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit RTS Applied Architectural Products, #2 Affidavit RTS Mako LLC, #3 Affidavit RTS Sovereign Builders, #4 Affidavit RTS Timothy Dixon)(Dortch, Timothy) Modified on 8/9/2019 (rpc, ).
August 8, 2019 Filing 31 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY. INCORRECT DOCKET EVENT USED*** AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Alejandro Padua; Bratten Inmobilia; Francisco Padua; Grace Management; Inmobilia 2000; Luisfina Corporation; Pauda Investments; Propero Conroe; Texas Senior Living Group; Texas Senior Living MGR; Texas Senior Living Operator; Woodhaven Inmobilia; CPF Living Communities II-Woodhaven on 08/02/2019, filed by Loeb Architects, LLC, Zelma M Loeb-Defever. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit RTS Bratten Inmobilia, #2 Affidavit RTS Francisco Padua, #3 Affidavit RTS Inmobilia 2000, #4 Affidavit RTS Luisfina Corporation, #5 Affidavit RTS Padua Investments, #6 Affidavit RTS Woodhaven Inmobilia, #7 Affidavit RTS Cottages at Woodhaven, #8 Affidavit RTS Propero Conroe, #9 Affidavit RTS Texas Senior Living Group, #10 Affidavit RTS Texas Senior Living Mgr, #11 Affidavit RTS Texas Senior Living Operator, #12 Affidavit RTS CPF Living Communities, #13 Affidavit RTS Grace Management)(Dortch, Timothy) Modified on 8/9/2019 (rpc, ).
August 1, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS Issued as to Woodhaven Inmobilia, Ltd. (rpc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS Issued as to W&P 1 Holdings, Inc. (rpc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS Issued as to Timothy G Dixon. (rpc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS Issued as to Texas Senior Living Operator, LLC. (rpc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS Issued as to Texas Senior Living Manager, LLC. (rpc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Issued as to Texas Senior Living Group, LLC. (rpc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Issued as to Ted Trout Architects, Ltd. (rpc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Issued as to Strategic Construction, Ltd. (rpc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Issued as to Sovereign Builders Group, Ltd. (rpc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Issued as to Propero Seniors Housing Fund, LLC. (rpc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Issued as to Propero Conroe, LLC. (rpc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Issued as to Robert Partin. (rpc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Issued as to Partin Investments, LLC. (rpc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Issued as to Padua Investments, Ltd. (rpc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Issued as to Mako, LLC. (rpc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Issued as to Luisfina Corporation. (rpc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Issued as to Inmobilia 2000, LLC. (rpc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Issued as to Grace Management, Inc. (rpc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued as to Francisco Padua. (rpc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued as to FCI Multi-Family Holdings, LLC. (rpc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued as to FCI Multi Family GP, LLC. (rpc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued as to CPF Living Communities II-Woodhaven, LLC. (rpc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to CPF Living Communities II Acquisitions, LLC. (rpc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to Cottages at Woodhaven Village, Ltd. (rpc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Bratten Inmobilia, LLC. (rpc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Applied Architectural Products, Inc. (rpc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Antonio Padua. (rpc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Alejandro Padua. (rpc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Copyright Form (AO 121). AO 121 mailed to the Register of Copyrights. (Dortch, Timothy)
August 1, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
July 31, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7373886.), filed by Loeb Architects, LLC, Zelma M Loeb-Defever. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dortch, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loeb-Defever et al v. Strategic Construction, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic Construction, Ltd. d/b/a FCI Multi-Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Management, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Parke Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Trout Architects, Ltd.
Represented By: Jessica Lauren Mangrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mako, LLC d/b/a Padua Realty Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe or Jane Doe, as Representative of the Estate of Whitson B. Etheridge, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W&P I Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Padua
Represented By: Paul L Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodhaven Inmobilia, Ltd.
Represented By: Paul L Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partin Investments, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Eugene Blanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Partin
Represented By: Patrick Eugene Blanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Padua Investments, Ltd.
Represented By: Paul L Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Senior Living Group, LLC
Represented By: Paul L Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy G Dixon
Represented By: Patrick Eugene Blanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sovereign Builders Group, Ltd. d/b/a FCI Multi-Family Builders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCI Multi-Family Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Eugene Blanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Senior Living Operator, LLC
Represented By: Paul L Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bratten Inmobilia, LLC
Represented By: Paul L Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Propero Conroe, LLC
Represented By: Robert Parke Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inmobilia 2000, LLC
Represented By: Paul L Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cottages at Woodhaven Village, Ltd.
Represented By: Paul L Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luisfina Corporation
Represented By: Paul L Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Propero Seniors Housing Fund, LLC
Represented By: Robert Parke Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Senior Living Manager, LLC
Represented By: Paul L Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPF Living Communities II-Woodhaven, LLC
Represented By: Robert Parke Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPF Living Communities II Acquisitions, LLC
Represented By: Robert Parke Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Applied Architectural Products, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Eugene Blanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Padua
Represented By: Paul L Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Padua
Represented By: Paul L Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCI Multi Family GP, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Eugene Blanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mako, LLC
Represented By: Paul L Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sovereign Builders Group, Ltd.
Represented By: Patrick Eugene Blanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic Construction, Ltd.
Represented By: Patrick Eugene Blanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W&P 1 Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Eugene Blanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loeb Architects, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Micah Dortch
Represented By: Patrick Zummo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zelma M Loeb-Defever
Represented By: Timothy Micah Dortch
Represented By: Patrick Zummo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?