Hiccups Franchising Corp et al v. L & K Foodies, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tea Fusion House, LLC, Hiccups Franchising Corp and Hiccups Veo Plaza
Defendant: L & K Foodies, LLC, Does 1-10, Inclusive, Karen Nguyen and Tam Tran
Case Number: 4:2019cv00592
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/7/2019. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 11/25/2019 at 01:30 PM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before District Judge Sean D. Jordan. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 10/4/2019. (rpc, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by L & K Foodies, LLC, Karen Nguyen, Tam Tran.(Moore, Caleb)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL CASES. It is hereby ORDERED that this civil action is transferred to the Honorable Sean D. Jordan, effective immediately. Upon transfer, any pretrial referral to a Magistrate Judge is REVOKED except in Social Security cases, Pro Se Non-Prisoner/Habeas cases, and mortgage cases, where the pretrial referral will stay in place. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by United States District Judge Amos L. Mazzant. District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III no longer assigned to the case. (kls, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to John D. Tran on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tran, John)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by John D. Tran on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7402618. (Tran, John) (Main Document 6 replaced with corrected version to correct CA admission date and Division on 8/22/2019) (jmv, ).
August 12, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
August 12, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Tam Tran. (rpc, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to L & K Foodies, LLC. (rpc, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Karen Nguyen. (rpc, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Complaint,.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es))(Wood, Robert)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7383199.), filed by Hiccups Franchising Corp, Hiccups Veo Plaza, d/b/a Hiccups. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Wood, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hiccups Franchising Corp et al v. L & K Foodies, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tea Fusion House, LLC
Represented By: Robert James Wood, Jr
Represented By: Timothy Blake Edwards
Represented By: John D. Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hiccups Franchising Corp
Represented By: Robert James Wood, Jr
Represented By: Timothy Blake Edwards
Represented By: John D. Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hiccups Veo Plaza
Represented By: Robert James Wood, Jr
Represented By: Timothy Blake Edwards
Represented By: John D. Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L & K Foodies, LLC
Represented By: Caleb I Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Nguyen
Represented By: Caleb I Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tam Tran
Represented By: Caleb I Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?