Yoo v. Amica Mutual Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Ho Yoo
Defendant: Jacob Carney, Amica Mutual Insurance Company, Mike McCullough, Jr and Jim Hitzelberger
Case Number: 4:2019cv00593
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re #21 First MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs Amended Summons & Complaint filed by Ho Yoo. (Paternostro, Charles)
October 3, 2019 Filing 26 ***DUPLICATE ENTRY. DOCKETED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6) filed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company, Jacob Carney. (O'Dell, Michael) Modified on 10/4/2019 (rpc, ).
October 3, 2019 Filing 25 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY. INCORRECT DOCKET EVENT USED*** REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 First MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs Amended Summons & Complaint Refiling as per Defendant's Request filed by Ho Yoo. (Paternostro, Charles) Modified on 10/3/2019 (rpc, ).
October 3, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6) filed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company, Jacob Carney. (O'Dell, Michael)
October 3, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #23 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6) subject to motion to strike plaintiffs amended summons & complaint submitted by Amica Mutual Insurance Company, Jacob Carney. The document should be filed using event Reply to Response to Motion. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
October 3, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 First MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs Amended Summons & Complaint Refiling as per Defendant's Request submitted by Ho Yoo. The document should be filed using event Response to Motion. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 23 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY. INCORRECT DOCKET EVENT USED*** RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6) subject to motion to strike plaintiffs amended summons & complaint filed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company, Jacob Carney. (O'Dell, Michael) Modified on 10/3/2019 (rpc, ).
October 2, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #21 First MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs Amended Summons & Complaint filed by Ho Yoo. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Paternostro, Charles) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/3/2019) (rpc, ).
October 1, 2019 Filing 21 First MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs Amended Summons & Complaint by Amica Mutual Insurance Company, Jacob Carney. Responses due by 10/14/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(O'Dell, Michael) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/2/2019) (baf, ).
September 25, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6) filed by Ho Yoo. (Paternostro, Charles)
September 25, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6) filed by Ho Yoo. (Paternostro, Charles)
September 25, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Amica Mutual Insurance Company, Jacob Carney, filed by Ho Yoo.(Paternostro, Charles)
September 19, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR - CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE ONLY - AMENDED MOTION SHOULD BE FILED TO CURE DEFICIENCY. Document # 17, NOTICE. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (baf, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 17 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR***NOTICE by Amica Mutual Insurance Company, Jacob Carney Defendants Certificate of Conference on Motion to Quash Subpoena (O'Dell, Michael) Modified on 9/19/2019 (baf, ).
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REFERRAL ORDER. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and Local Rule CV-72, the undersigned hereby REFERS the cases set forth below to U. S. Magistrate Judge Kimberly C. Priest Johnson for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 9/18/2019. (baf, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 15 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD*** MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Amica Mutual Insurance Company, Jacob Carney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(O'Dell, Michael) Modified on 9/17/2019 (baf, ).
September 17, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION TO QUASH submitted DOCUMENT #15 - NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
September 16, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint Subject to Motion to Dismiss by Amica Mutual Insurance Company, Jacob Carney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(O'Dell, Michael)
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6) by Amica Mutual Insurance Company, Jacob Carney. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Dell, Michael)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Ho Yoo (Paternostro, Charles)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL CASES. It is hereby ORDERED that this civil action is transferred to the Honorable Sean D. Jordan, effective immediately. Upon transfer, any pretrial referral to a Magistrate Judge is REVOKED except in Social Security cases, Pro Se Non-Prisoner/Habeas cases, and mortgage cases, where the pretrial referral will stay in place. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by United States District Judge Amos L. Mazzant. District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III no longer assigned to the case. (kls, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ho Yoo. (Paternostro, Charles)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Indigency Form by Ho Yoo. (Paternostro, Charles)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Ho Yoo. (Paternostro, Charles) Modified on 8/26/2019 (baf, ).
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Charles J Paternostro on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7408495. (Paternostro, Charles) (Main Document 8 replaced on 8/26/2019 - attorney attached wrong document) (jmv, ). (Additional attachment(s)that defense atty requested of pltf attorney added on 10/1/2019: #1 attachment) (jmv, ).
August 26, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS submitted DOCUMENT #9 - INCORRECT DOCKET EVENT USED FOR FILING. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Charles J. Paternostro, attorney for Ho Yoo as to #6 Order & Advisory. (baf, )
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND ADVISORY re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Jacob Carney, Amica Mutual Insurance Company. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/13/2019. (baf, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #4 Petition by Amica Mutual Insurance Company, Jacob Carney.(rpc, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** PETITION against Amica Mutual Insurance Company, Jacob Carney, filed by Ho Yoo.(rpc, )
August 9, 2019 Notified Plaintiff's Attorney, Charles J. Paternostro, Per GO 04-12, this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. ***ATTORNEY NOT ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN OUR COURT - LETTER SENT VIA EMAIL*** (rpc, )
August 9, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
August 8, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #2 Additional Attachments to Main Document, #1 Notice of Removal,,.. (O'Dell, Michael)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Notice of Removal,,.. (O'Dell, Michael)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jacob Carney, Amica Mutual Insurance Company from 416th Judicial District, Collin County, TX, case number 416-01697-2019. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7384261), filed by Jacob Carney, Amica Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Errata A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5, #7 Exhibit A-6, #8 Exhibit A-7, #9 Exhibit A-8, #10 Exhibit A-9, #11 Exhibit A-10, #12 Exhibit A-11, #13 Exhibit B, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Dell, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yoo v. Amica Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Carney
Represented By: Kaitlin H Kerr
Represented By: Michael Shane O'Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amica Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Kaitlin H Kerr
Represented By: Michael Shane O'Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike McCullough, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Hitzelberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ho Yoo
Represented By: Charles J Paternostro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?