Spann v. Frisco Independent School District
Plaintiff: Theresa A Spann
Defendant: Frisco Independent School District
Case Number: 4:2019cv00603
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Referring Judge: Amos L Mazzant
2 Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued as to Frisco Independent School District, forwarded to USM for service. (daj, )
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall prepare service of process on the Defendant in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas and provide such to the Clerk of the Court on or before Monday, October 7, 2019 at 5:00 p.m.. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall issue process and the United States Marshal shall serve process upon the Defendant within thirty (30) days of receiving completed process from the Clerk of the Court. It is further ORDERED that the failure by Plaintiff to comply with the orders contained herein may result in the dismissal of this lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 9/18/2019. (daj, )
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL CASES. It is hereby ORDERED that this civil action is transferred to the Honorable Sean D. Jordan, effective immediately. Upon transfer, any pretrial referral to a Magistrate Judge is REVOKED except in Social Security cases, Pro Se Non-Prisoner/Habeas cases, and mortgage cases, where the pretrial referral will stay in place. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by United States District Judge Amos L. Mazzant. District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III no longer assigned to the case. (kls, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Theresa A Spann as to #9 Order. (rpc, )
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 8/14/2019. (daj, )
August 12, 2019 Note: Pursuant to Local Rule CV-7(j), any motions pending in another federal or state court made by any party will be considered moot at the time of transfer or removal unless they are re-urged in this court. (daj, )
August 12, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. **Consent form mailed to plaintiff. (daj, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and referred to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate referral) (daj, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-01738. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 22, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Mon Jul 22 16:23:48 CDT 2019 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: This action will be transferred under the undersigned's authority granted by Rule 2(a)(3) of the Court's Miscellaneous Order No. 6 to the Sherman Division of the Eastern District of Texas on 8/12/2019, to allow any party to file an objection to Chief Judge Lynn within 14 days after being served with a copy of this order. If an objection is filed, the order of transfer is stayed pending further order of the Court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 7/22/2019) (ykp) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 19, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Fri Jul 19 15:36:04 CDT 2019 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Theresa A Spann. (mla) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Theresa A Spann. (mla) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Frisco Independent School District filed by Theresa A Spann. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (mla) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (mla) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spann v. Frisco Independent School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa A Spann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frisco Independent School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?